This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2022 at 09:38:35 (UTC).

Miller v. American Medical Systems, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 Miller filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against American Medical Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01757

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anita Miller

Defendants

American Medical Systems, Inc.

Astora Women's Health, LLC

American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc.

Astora Women's Health, Inc.

Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Astora Women's Health LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher W Cantrell

550 West B Street, Fourth Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Christopher W. Cantrell

Attorney at Doyle APC

550 West B Street, Fourth Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

William James Doyle, II

Attorney at Doyle APC

550 West B Street, Fourth Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

David E. Stanley

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/5/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2022) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

21 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

21 #21

Main Document

#18

(#18) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Women's Health LLC.. (Stanley, David) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Certain Defendants Without Prejudice filed by American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Women's Health LLC. (Stanley, David) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#15

(#15) Certificate of Interested Entities by American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Women's Health LLC (Stanley, David) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Stanley (Stanley, David) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2022 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Anita Miller . (Cantrell, Christopher) (Filed on 3/21/2022) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

1 #7

Summons Summons_Endo Health Solutions, Inc

1 #6

Summons Summons_Endo Health Solutions

1 #5

Summons Summons_Astora Women's Health LLC

1 #4

Summons Summons_Astora Women's Health Holdings

1 #3

Summons Summons_American Medical Systems, Inc.

1 #2

Summons Summons_American Medical Systems Holdings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/5/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2022) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Case reassigned to Judge James Donato. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2022) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • Docket(#20) This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2022) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket(#19) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Women's Health LLC.. (Stanley, David) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket(#17) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Astora Women's Health LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/17/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Certain Defendants Without Prejudice filed by American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Women's Health LLC. (Stanley, David) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Certificate of Interested Entities by American Medical Systems, Inc., Astora Women's Health LLC (Stanley, David) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Stanley (Stanley, David) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING 6/21/22 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 6/14/22. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/22 is advanced to 6/14/2022 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2022.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.c and.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated b y the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2022) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Endo Health Solutions, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Astora Women's Health, LLC. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to American Medical Systems, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2022 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Anita Miller . (Cantrell, Christopher) (Filed on 3/21/2022) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] Please resubmit current Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/2020) from our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No ju dge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Anita Miller (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2022) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages; Jury Trial Demanded against Astora Women's Health System, LLC, Astora Women's Health, Inc., Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17009217.). Filed by Anita Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Summons_American Medical Systems Holdings, #3 Summons_American Medical Systems, Inc., #4 Summons_Astora Women's Health Holdings, #5 Summons_Astora Women's Health LLC, #6 Summons_Endo Health Solutions, #7 Summons_Endo Health Solutions, Inc) (Cantrell, Christopher) (Filed on 3/18/2022) Modified on 3/22/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Astora Women's Health is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Health Solutions Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant