This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2021 at 07:48:16 (UTC).

MILLER INDUSTRIES TOWING EQUIPMENT INC. v. NRC INDUSTRIES

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 MILLER INDUSTRIES TOWING EQUIPMENT INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against NRC INDUSTRIES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen M. Williams and Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08158

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen M. Williams

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER INDUSTRIES TOWING EQUIPMENT INC.

Defendant

NRC INDUSTRIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KATELYN O'REILLY

Attorney at WALSH PIZZI O'REILLY FALANGA LLP

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR

Attorney at WALSH PIZZI O'REILLY FALANGA LLP

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

LIZA M. WALSH

Attorney at WALSH PIZZI O'REILLY FALANGA LLP

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Defendant Attorneys

GENE Y. KANG

Attorney at RIVKIN RADLER LLP

25 Main Street- Suite 501, Court Plaza North

Hackensack, NJ 07601

GREGORY D. MILLER

Attorney at RIVKIN RADLER LLP

25 Main Street, Suite 501, Court Plaza North

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

14 #7

Certificate of Service

14 #6

Text of Proposed Order

14 #5

Declaration of Megan E. Christner

14 #4

Declaration of Todd S. Werner

14 #3

Declaration of J. Derek Vandenburgh

14 #2

Declaration of Gregory D. Miller

14 #1

Statement in Lieu of Brief

#14

(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. Derek Vandenburgh, Todd S. Werner, and Megan E. Christner by NRC INDUSTRIES. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #3 Declaration of J. Derek Vandenburgh, #4 Declaration of Todd S. Werner, #5 Declaration of Megan E. Christner, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, GREGORY) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

13 #5

Text of Proposed Order

13 #4

Statement in Lieu of Brief

13 #3

Certification of Liza M. Walsh

13 #2

Certification of Paul R. Hale

13 #1

Certification of Michael P. Mazza

#13

(#13) Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MILLER INDUSTRIES TOWING EQUIPMENT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael P. Mazza, #2 Certification of Paul R. Hale, #3 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #4 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant NRC Industries to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until 6/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/7/2021. (dmr) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

11 #1

Cover Letter

#11

(#11) STIPULATION by NRC INDUSTRIES. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(MILLER, GREGORY) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by GENE Y. KANG on behalf of NRC INDUSTRIES (KANG, GENE) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. Derek Vandenburgh, Todd S. Werner, and Megan E. Christner. Motion set for 6/7/2021 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. Derek Vandenburgh, Todd S. Werner, and Megan E. Christner by NRC INDUSTRIES. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #3 Declaration of J. Derek Vandenburgh, #4 Declaration of Todd S. Werner, #5 Declaration of Megan E. Christner, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, GREGORY) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #13 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 6/7/2021 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MILLER INDUSTRIES TOWING EQUIPMENT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael P. Mazza, #2 Certification of Paul R. Hale, #3 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #4 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant NRC Industries to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until 6/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/7/2021. (dmr) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION by NRC INDUSTRIES. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(MILLER, GREGORY) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by GENE Y. KANG on behalf of NRC INDUSTRIES (KANG, GENE) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY D. MILLER on behalf of NRC INDUSTRIES (MILLER, GREGORY) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MILLER INDUSTRIES TOWING EQUIPMENT INC.. NRC INDUSTRIES served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT) (pr, ) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR on behalf of MILLER INDUSTRIES TOWING EQUIPMENT INC. (WALSH, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by KATELYN O'REILLY on behalf of MILLER INDUSTRIES TOWING EQUIPMENT INC. (O'REILLY, KATELYN) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to NRC INDUSTRIES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, ) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (pr, ) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketJudge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MILLER INDUSTRIES TOWING EQUIPMENT INC.. (WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NRC INDUSTRIES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12336497), filed by MILLER INDUSTRIES TOWING EQUIPMENT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Civil Cover Sheet, #18 AO120 Form)(WALSH, LIZA) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory David Miller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GENE Y. KANG