This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2021 at 10:06:14 (UTC).

Annette Miller Follette v. American Medical Systems Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 Annette Miller Follette filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against American Medical Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08591

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Annette Miller-Follette

Annette Miller Follette

Defendants

American Medical Systems Inc

American Medical Systems, LLC

American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc.

Astora Women's Health, Inc.

Astora Women's Health LLC

Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC

Astora Holdings, LLC

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc

Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

American Medical Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Breanne V Cope

Attorney at Common Sense Counsel LLP

1333 Paloma Avenue

Burlingame, CA 94010

Defendant Attorney

David E Stanley

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY 30 DAYS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Defendants shall have until and including Thursday January 27, 2022, to serve and file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint. re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #34 (vm) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

34 #1

Proposed Order

34 #34

Main Document

#33

(#33) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#32

(#32) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT AND PROOF OF SERVICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The previous order is DISCHARGED with no further consequence. (vm) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#31

(#31) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annette Miller Follette, upon Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Phoebe Omolo, Service of Process Intake Clerk for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#30

(#30) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annette Miller Follette, upon Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc. served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Beth Miles, Legal Representative for Defendant Endo Pharmaceutical Holdings Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#29

(#29) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annette Miller Follette, upon Defendant American Medical Systems, LLC served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Beth Miles, Legal Representative for Defendant American Medical Systems LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#28

(#28) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annette Miller Follette, upon Defendant Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Phoebe Omolo, Service of Process Intake Clerk for Defendant Endo Health Solutions Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette, identifying American Medical Systems, Inc., et al.. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#1

(#34) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Astora Women's Health LLC answer now due 1/27/2022; Endo Health Solutions, Inc. answer now due 1/27/2022; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc answer now due 1/27/2022; American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc. answer now due 1/27/2022; Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc. answer now due 1/27/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Astora Women's Health LLC; Endo Health Solutions, Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc; American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney David E Stanley added to party American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Astora Women's Health LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Endo Health Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc(pty:dft))(Stanley, David) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY 30 DAYS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Defendants shall have until and including Thursday January 27, 2022, to serve and file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint. re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #34 (vm) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Astora Women's Health LLC answer now due 1/27/2022; Endo Health Solutions, Inc. answer now due 1/27/2022; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc answer now due 1/27/2022; American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc. answer now due 1/27/2022; Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc. answer now due 1/27/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Astora Women's Health LLC; Endo Health Solutions, Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc; American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney David E Stanley added to party American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Astora Women's Health LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Endo Health Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David E Stanley added to party Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc(pty:dft))(Stanley, David) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT AND PROOF OF SERVICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The previous order is DISCHARGED with no further consequence. (vm) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annette Miller Follette, upon Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Phoebe Omolo, Service of Process Intake Clerk for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annette Miller Follette, upon Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc. served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Beth Miles, Legal Representative for Defendant Endo Pharmaceutical Holdings Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annette Miller Follette, upon Defendant American Medical Systems, LLC served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Beth Miles, Legal Representative for Defendant American Medical Systems LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annette Miller Follette, upon Defendant Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Phoebe Omolo, Service of Process Intake Clerk for Defendant Endo Health Solutions Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annette Miller Follette, upon Defendant American Medical Systems Inc served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Beth Miles, Legal Representative for Defendant American Medical Systems Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annette Miller Follette, upon Defendant Astora Women's Health LLC served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Beth Miles, Legal Representative for Defendant Astora Women's Health LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette, identifying American Medical Systems, Inc., et al.. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32245371 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Annette Miller-Follette. (Attorney Breanne V Cope added to party Annette Miller-Follette(pty:pla))(Cope, Breanne) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Astora Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Astora Women's Health is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant