This case was last updated from PACER on 06/16/2020 at 10:03:52 (UTC).

Miller et al v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

Case Summary

On 04/17/2020 Miller filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy E. Brasel and David T. Schultz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00971

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy E. Brasel

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stacey Miller

Timothy A. Miller

Defendant

Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan L R Drewes

Attorney at Drewes Law, PLLC

10 Ne Second Street, Ste 205

Minneapolis, MN 55413

Defendant Attorney

Keith S Anderson

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

One Federal Place, 1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/10/2020. Fact Discovery due by 12/9/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 1/11/2021. Motions (disp) due by 1/25/2021. Ready for trial due by 5/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/4/2020.(TJB) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#7

(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Stacey Miller, Timothy A. Miller. Jointly Signed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee.(Drewes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

6 #1

Consent Form

#6

(#6) ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 6/2/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/2/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TJB) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Anderson, Keith) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB is a wholly-owned subsidiary of WSFS Financial Corporation. (Anderson, Keith) Modified text on 4/20/2020 (MMG). (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of the Mill City Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-3 re #1 Notice of Removal, (Anderson, Keith) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tenth Judicial District Court of Anoka County, Minnesota, case number 02-CV-20-1458 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7654405) filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of the Mill City Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-3. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Anderson, Keith) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/10/2020. Fact Discovery due by 12/9/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 1/11/2021. Motions (disp) due by 1/25/2021. Ready for trial due by 5/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/4/2020.(TJB) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket(#8) (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing. Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz is CANCELLED. A scheduling order will issue. (TJB) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Stacey Miller, Timothy A. Miller. Jointly Signed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee.(Drewes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 6/2/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/2/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TJB) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Anderson, Keith) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-CV-971 (NEB/DTS). (MMP) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB is a wholly-owned subsidiary of WSFS Financial Corporation. (Anderson, Keith) Modified text on 4/20/2020 (MMG). (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of the Mill City Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-3 re #1 Notice of Removal, (Anderson, Keith) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tenth Judicial District Court of Anoka County, Minnesota, case number 02-CV-20-1458 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7654405) filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee of the Mill City Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-3. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Anderson, Keith) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less