This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2023 at 07:40:59 (UTC).

MILLER et al v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 MILLER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05151

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LISA MILLER

R. CHRISTOPHER MILLER

SHANE EAGAR

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALE G. LARRIMORE

Defendant Attorneys

KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS

JAMES P. SHAY

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16394889), filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES P. SHAY on behalf of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (SHAY, JAMES) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/24/2023 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE ZOOM INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov NO LATER THAN FIVE 5 DAYS PRIOR TO CONFERENCE (Attachments: #1 ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER, #2 JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F)(amw) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

7 #1

ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER

7 #2

JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F

#8

(#8) Report Of Rule 26f Meeting (Joint) by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT DISCOVERY DUE BY 5/24/2023., MOTIONS DUE BY 9/5/2023., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 9/5/2023. CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LLORET FOR SETTLEMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/24/23. 1/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#10

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE Pretrial Conference held on 1/24/23. (rf, ) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT DISCOVERY DUE BY 5/24/2023., MOTIONS DUE BY 9/5/2023., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 9/5/2023. CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LLORET FOR SETTLEMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/24/23. 1/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report Of Rule 26f Meeting (Joint) by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/24/2023 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE ZOOM INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov NO LATER THAN FIVE 5 DAYS PRIOR TO CONFERENCE (Attachments: #1 ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER, #2 JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F)(amw) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • Docket(#5) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ke) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES P. SHAY on behalf of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (SHAY, JAMES) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16394889), filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less