This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:45:35 (UTC).

Miller et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Miller filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Safeco Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is James L. Robart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James L. Robart

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kelly Grace

Alvin Miller

Defendant

Safeco Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick H LePley

Attorney at LEPLEY LAW FIRM

12600 Se 38Th Street, Suite 201

Bellevue, WA 98006

Defendant Attorney

Matthew S Adams

Attorney at FORSBERG & UMLAUF (SEA)

901 5Th Ave, Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98164-1039

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-31779-5-KNT; (Receipt # 0981-6074181), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Adams, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Adams, Matthew) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Safeco Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Adams, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *7 days*. Jury Trial is set for 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 3/24/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/9/2020, Motions due by 1/8/2021, Discovery completed by 2/8/2021, Dispositive motions due by 3/9/2021, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 4/8/2021, Motions in Limine due by 4/26/2021, Pretrial Order due by 5/17/2021, Deposition Designations due by 5/19/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/1/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/1/2021. (AD) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#4

(#4) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (Adams, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #2

Complaint

2 #2

Exhibit

#6

(#6) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 2/21/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/31/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/14/2020. (AD) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

2 #3

Exhibit

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#10

(#10) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7. (LePley, Patrick) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

3 #2

Exhibit

2 #1

Exhibit

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *7 days*. Jury Trial is set for 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 3/24/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/9/2020, Motions due by 1/8/2021, Discovery completed by 2/8/2021, Dispositive motions due by 3/9/2021, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 4/8/2021, Motions in Limine due by 4/26/2021, Pretrial Order due by 5/17/2021, Deposition Designations due by 5/19/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/1/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/1/2021. (AD) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7. (LePley, Patrick) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Adams, Matthew) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 2/21/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/31/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/14/2020. (AD) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketJudge James L. Robart added. (GT) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Safeco Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Adams, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (Adams, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Plaintiff re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Adams, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Matthew S. Adams re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Adams, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-31779-5-KNT; (Receipt # 0981-6074181), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Adams, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less