This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2021 at 05:51:45 (UTC).

MILLER et al v. GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 MILLER filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-06947

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Charles Miller

CORNELIUS JACKSON

DEVON TROTTER

Gregory Robertson

RITA COVINGTON

VANESSA PHILLIPS

William Davis

Defendant

Gilead Sciences Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mikal C. Watts

Attorney at Watts Guerra LLP

5726 W. Hausman Road Suite 119

San Antonio, TX 78249

Defendant Attorney

Paul John Zidlicky

Attorney at SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP

1501 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-01819. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/08/2021)

12 #1

Memorandum in Support

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to the Northern District of California by RITA COVINGTON, WILLIAM F. DAVIS, CORNELIUS JACKSON, CHARLES E. MILLER, VANESSA PHILLIPS, GREGORY ROBERTSON, DEVON TROTTER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Watts, Mikal) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Mikal C. Watts on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Watts, Mikal) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to move, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (Zidlicky, Paul) Modified event on 8/12/2021 (ztd). (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#8

MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant shall have until 08/13/2021 to file its Answer or other Response in this matter. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/13/2021. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zsb) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#6

(#6) ERRATA Notice of Removal by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. re Notice of QC- New Case,. (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-06972-JST; 20-cv-01026-MMH-PDB; 21-cv-01418-KM-JBC; 21-cv-01774-MGL; 20-cv-01523-MTS; 21-cv-481-TDS-JEP. (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul John Zidlicky on behalf of GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#7) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zsb) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-01819. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docket(#13) Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of California pursuant to Order on Motion to Transfer Case,, Sent to Court via extraction. (ztd) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Transfer by 9/7/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS #12 the parties' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/26/2021. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to the Northern District of California by RITA COVINGTON, WILLIAM F. DAVIS, CORNELIUS JACKSON, CHARLES E. MILLER, VANESSA PHILLIPS, GREGORY ROBERTSON, DEVON TROTTER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Watts, Mikal) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Mikal C. Watts on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Watts, Mikal) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS in part #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant shall file any response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 9/13/2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/13/2021. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to move, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (Zidlicky, Paul) Modified event on 8/12/2021 (ztd). (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant shall have until 08/13/2021 to file its Answer or other Response in this matter. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/13/2021. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to MOVE, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zsb) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ERRATA Notice of Removal by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. re Notice of QC- New Case,. (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to pzidlicky@sidley.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-06972-JST; 20-cv-01026-MMH-PDB; 21-cv-01418-KM-JBC; 21-cv-01774-MGL; 20-cv-01523-MTS; 21-cv-481-TDS-JEP. (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul John Zidlicky on behalf of GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from DC Superior Court, case number 2021CA001961B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8584891 filed by GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul John Zidlicky