This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2020 at 09:43:57 (UTC).

Miller et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 Miller filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Shelby and Cecilia M. Romero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00692

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Shelby

Referral Judge

Cecilia M. Romero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wylynn Miller

Gibb Miller

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan J. Schriever

51 E 800 N

Spanish Fork, UT 84660

Defendant Attorneys

Heidi G. Goebel

Attorney at GOEBEL ANDERSON PC

405 S Main St Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Hannah C. Carter

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

1144 Fifteenth St Ste 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Heather Carson Perkins

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1144 Fifteenth Street Ste 3400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#10

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

9 #1

Exhibit Application

#9

8 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

8 #1

Exhibit Application

#8

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss

#7

#6

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#5

#4

#3

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/29/2020. (mjm) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorneys Hannah C. Carter,Heather Carson Perkins for Boston Scientific Corporation.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/22/20. (dla) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Heather Carson Perkins , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3768012,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hannah C. Carter , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3767989,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss)(Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint: Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to October 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/6/20. (dla) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation, Plaintiffs Gibb Miller & Wylynn Miller. (dw) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation identifying Boston Scientific Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 7th District Court Carbon County, case number 200700041, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3740013) filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (dw) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan J. Schriever