This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 07:22:00 (UTC).

Miller et al v. Astellas US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Miller filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Astellas US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. Guzman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03882

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. Guzman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sheila Early

Eric Terhaerdt

Michael Wachala

Faurum Sankari

Mary Beth Preuss

Patricia Walsh

Susan Woerth Miller

Angela Heimgartner

Defendants

Astellas US LLC

John Doe (1-14)

The Astellas Retirement Plan Administrative Committee

The Board of Directors of Astellas US LLC

Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sean E. Soyars

Attorney at Schlichter Bogard & Denton

100 South Fourth Street, Suite 1200

St. Louis, MO 63102

Jerome J Schlichter

Attorney at Schlichter Bogard & Denton

100 S. 4Th Street, Suite 1200

St. Louis, MO 63102

Michael Armin Wolff

Attorney at Schlichter, Bogard & Denton, LLP

100 South Fourth Street, Suite 1200

St. Louis, MO 63102

Luke DeGrand

Attorney at DeGrand & Wolfe, P.C.

20 South Clark Street, Suite 2620

Chicago, IL 60603

Kurt C Struckhoff

Attorney at Schlichter Bogard And Denton

100 South Fourth Street, Suite 1200

St. Louis, MO 63102

Tracey L. Wolfe

Attorney at DeGrand & Wolfe, P.C.

20 South Clark Street, Suite 2620

Chicago, IL 60603

Troy A. Doles

Attorney at Schlichter Bogard & Denton

100 South Fourth Street, Suite 1200

St. Louis, MO 63102

Heather Lea

Attorney at Schlichter Bogard & Denton

100 S. 4Th Street, Suite 900

St. Louis, MO 63102

Defendant Attorneys

Shannon M. Barrett

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1625 I St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Stuart Michael Sarnoff

Attorney at O''Melveny & Myers LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

William David Pollak

Attorney at O''Melveny & Myers LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

John R Landis

Attorney at Foley & Lardner

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

Alison Kelly Ward

Attorney at O''Melveny & Myers LLP

7 Times Square, Times Square Tower

New York, NY 10036

Jeffrey Andrew Soble

Attorney at Foley & Lardner

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

Brian D. Boyle

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1625 Eye Street. N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc. Aon Investment USA, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Notification as to Affiliates (Landis, John) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#28

(#28) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc. by Brian D. Boyle (Boyle, Brian) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#27

(#27) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc. by Shannon M. Barrett (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#26

(#26) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorney Alison Kelly Ward motion to appear pro hac vice #25 on behalf of Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc. is granted. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#25

(#25) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17367713. (Ward, Alison) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#24

(#24) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorney Stuart Michael Sarnoff and William David Pollak motion to appear pro hac vice #22 , #23 on behalf of Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc. is granted. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#23

(#23) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17364167. (Pollak, William) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#22

(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17364090. (Sarnoff, Stuart) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#21

(#21) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc. by Jeffrey Andrew Soble (Soble, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#18

(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendant Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc.'s unopposed motion for leave to file brief in excess of page limit #18 is granted. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Eric Terhaerdt, Angela Heimgartner, Patricia Walsh, Faurum Sankari, Sheila Early, Susan Woerth Miller, Michael Wachala, Mary Beth Preuss. Astellas US LLC waiver sent on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Schlichter, Jerome) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sheila Early, Angela Heimgartner, Susan Woerth Miller, Mary Beth Preuss, Faurum Sankari, Eric Terhaerdt, Michael Wachala, Patricia Walsh by Tracey L. Wolfe (Wolfe, Tracey) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sheila Early, Angela Heimgartner, Susan Woerth Miller, Mary Beth Preuss, Faurum Sankari, Eric Terhaerdt, Michael Wachala, Patricia Walsh by Luke DeGrand (DeGrand, Luke) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sheila Early, Angela Heimgartner, Susan Woerth Miller, Mary Beth Preuss, Faurum Sankari, Eric Terhaerdt, Michael Wachala, Patricia Walsh by Sean E. Soyars (Soyars, Sean) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sheila Early, Angela Heimgartner, Susan Woerth Miller, Mary Beth Preuss, Faurum Sankari, Eric Terhaerdt, Michael Wachala, Patricia Walsh by Michael Armin Wolff (Wolff, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sheila Early, Angela Heimgartner, Susan Woerth Miller, Mary Beth Preuss, Faurum Sankari, Eric Terhaerdt, Michael Wachala, Patricia Walsh by Jerome J Schlichter (Schlichter, Jerome) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schlichter, Jerome) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Eric Terhaerdt, Angela Heimgartner, Patricia Walsh, Faurum Sankari, Sheila Early, Susan Woerth Miller, Michael Wachala, Mary Beth Preuss; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17167174.(Schlichter, Jerome) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc. Aon Investment USA, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Notification as to Affiliates (Landis, John) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc. by Brian D. Boyle (Boyle, Brian) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc. by Shannon M. Barrett (Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorney Alison Kelly Ward motion to appear pro hac vice #25 on behalf of Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc. is granted. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17367713. (Ward, Alison) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorney Stuart Michael Sarnoff and William David Pollak motion to appear pro hac vice #22 , #23 on behalf of Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc. is granted. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17364167. (Pollak, William) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17364090. (Sarnoff, Stuart) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc. by Jeffrey Andrew Soble (Soble, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendant Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc.'s unopposed motion for leave to file brief in excess of page limit #18 is granted. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Eric Terhaerdt, Angela Heimgartner, Patricia Walsh, Faurum Sankari, Sheila Early, Susan Woerth Miller, Michael Wachala, Mary Beth Preuss. Astellas US LLC waiver sent on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Schlichter, Jerome) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting Inc., Astellas US LLC, The Astellas Retirement Plan Administrative Committee, The Board of Directors of Astellas US LLC (mp, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sheila Early, Angela Heimgartner, Susan Woerth Miller, Mary Beth Preuss, Faurum Sankari, Eric Terhaerdt, Michael Wachala, Patricia Walsh by Tracey L. Wolfe (Wolfe, Tracey) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sheila Early, Angela Heimgartner, Susan Woerth Miller, Mary Beth Preuss, Faurum Sankari, Eric Terhaerdt, Michael Wachala, Patricia Walsh by Luke DeGrand (DeGrand, Luke) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, ) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sheila Early, Angela Heimgartner, Susan Woerth Miller, Mary Beth Preuss, Faurum Sankari, Eric Terhaerdt, Michael Wachala, Patricia Walsh by Sean E. Soyars (Soyars, Sean) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sheila Early, Angela Heimgartner, Susan Woerth Miller, Mary Beth Preuss, Faurum Sankari, Eric Terhaerdt, Michael Wachala, Patricia Walsh by Michael Armin Wolff (Wolff, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Sheila Early, Angela Heimgartner, Susan Woerth Miller, Mary Beth Preuss, Faurum Sankari, Eric Terhaerdt, Michael Wachala, Patricia Walsh by Jerome J Schlichter (Schlichter, Jerome) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schlichter, Jerome) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Eric Terhaerdt, Angela Heimgartner, Patricia Walsh, Faurum Sankari, Sheila Early, Susan Woerth Miller, Michael Wachala, Mary Beth Preuss; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17167174.(Schlichter, Jerome) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AON Hewitt Investment Consulting, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Astellas US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shannon M. Barrett