This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2020 at 10:53:25 (UTC).

Miller et al v. Alecto Healthcare Services Fairmont, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Miller filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Alecto Healthcare Services Fairmont, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Irene M. Keeley and Thomas S. Kleeh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00111

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Irene M. Keeley

Thomas S. Kleeh

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marsue Lancaster

John Whitaker

David Armstrong

Stuart Appelbaum

Michael Adams

Donald R. Hopkins

Jack Wurm, Jr.

Lenore F. Miller

Defendants

Alecto Healthcare Services Fairmont, LLC

Fairmont General Hospital

Alecto Healthcare Services Fairmont, LLC doing business as Fairmont Regional Medical Center also known as Fairmont General Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anusha Rasalingam

Attorney at Friedman & Anspach

1500 Broadway, Suite 2300

New York, NY 10036

Timothy F. Cogan

Attorney at Cassidy, Cogan, Shapell & Voegelin, L.C.

First State Capitol Building, 1413 Eoff Street

Wheeling, WV 26003

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A-Trust Agreements

1 #2

Exhibit B-Settlement Agreement

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

4 #1

Proposed Order

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Whitaker, David Armstrong, Stuart Appelbaum, Lenore F. Miller, Michael Adams, Donald R. Hopkins, Marsue Lancaster, Jack Wurm, Jr. Alecto Healthcare Services Fairmont, LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Cogan, Timothy) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER transferring the above-styled action to the Honorable Thomas S. Kleeh for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/2/2020. (dk) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anusha Rasalingam. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 6/23/2020. (wrr) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Filing fee as to Anusha Rasalingam: PAID $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002964. (wrr) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Adams, Stuart Appelbaum, David Armstrong, Donald R. Hopkins, Marsue Lancaster, Lenore F. Miller, John Whitaker, Jack Wurm, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cogan, Timothy) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Anusha Rasalingam. (wrr) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Alecto Healthcare Services Fairmont, LLC, filed by John Whitaker, David Armstrong, Stuart Appelbaum, Lenore F. Miller, Michael Adams, Donald R. Hopkins, Marsue Lancaster, Jack Wurm, Jr.Filing Fee $400 PAID, Receipt #0424-3054574. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Trust Agreements, #2 Exhibit B-Settlement Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(wrr) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anusha Rasalingam

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy F. Cogan