This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2019 at 08:04:30 (UTC).

Millard v. The United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 Millard filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against The United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Roberto A. Lange. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03015

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roberto A. Lange

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roy Derek Millard

Derek Roy Millard

Defendants

Rosebud Sioux Tribe

The United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tyler Haigh

Attorney at Evans Haigh & Hinton LLP

101 North Main Avenue, Suite 213, Po Box 2790

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2790

Ryan W.W. Redd

Attorney at Evans Haigh & Hinton LLP

101 North Main Avenue, Suite 213, Po Box 2790

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2790

Defendant Attorney

Delia M. Druley (USA)

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Sioux Falls, SD)

Po Box 2638

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Summons

3 #2

AO 85

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3127243) filed by Derek Roy Millard in shell case on 8/7/2019. (CLR) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct text (CLR). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Delia M. Druley (USA) on behalf of The United States of America. (Druley (USA), Delia) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(DLC) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant The United States of America on Diana Ryan, Chief Civil Division (Haigh, Tyler) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Derek Roy Millard. (Haigh, Tyler) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct text (CLR). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Delia M. Druley (USA) on behalf of The United States of America. (Druley (USA), Delia) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant The United States of America on Diana Ryan, Chief Civil Division (Haigh, Tyler) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(DLC) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Derek Roy Millard. (Haigh, Tyler) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct text (CLR). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3127243) filed by Derek Roy Millard in shell case on 8/7/2019. (CLR) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct text (CLR). (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.