This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/26/2023 at 08:51:27 (UTC).

Milkmen Design, LLC v. DGL Group Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 Milkmen Design, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against DGL Group Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Lioi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00153

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Lioi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Milkmen Design, LLC

Defendants

DGL Group Ltd.

Five Below, Inc.

1616 Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Howard L. Wernow

James F. McCarthy, III

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 04/10/2023 to answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Milkmen Design, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#11

(#11) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Five Below, Inc. on 2/17/2023, filed on behalf of Milkmen Design, LLC. Related document(s) 8 , #4 . (S,T) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#10

(#10) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon 1616 Holdings, Inc. on 2/15/2023, filed on behalf of plaintiff Milkmen Design, LLC Related document(s) 8 , #4 . (S,T) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#9

(#9) Return of Service by personal service executed upon DGL Group Ltd. on 2/1/2023, filed on behalf of Milkmen Design, LLC (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#7

(#7) Attorney Appearance by James F. McCarthy, III filed on behalf of Milkmen Design, LLC. (McCarthy, James) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

6 #2

Exhibit B-Annotated Page Identifying Error

6 #1

Exhibit A-Revised Page of Complaint

4 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#4

(#4) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,T) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

1 #8

Summons 1616 Holdings, Inc.

1 #7

Summons Five Below, Inc.

1 #6

Summons DGL Group Ltd

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D-USD960654

1 #3

Exhibit C-USD960653

1 #2

Exhibit B-US10967776

1 #1

Exhibit A-USD899196

#1

(#1) Complaint for patent infringement with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11808063. Filed by Milkmen Design, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USD899196, #2 Exhibit B - US10967776, #3 Exhibit C - USD960653, #4 Exhibit D - USD960654, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - DGL Group Ltd, #7 Summons - Five Below, Inc., #8 Summons - 1616 Holdings, Inc.) (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document]: For good cause shown, plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time for defendants to respond to the complaint is granted. (Doc. No. #12 .) Defendants shall have up to and including April 10, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/1/2023. (V,A) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 04/10/2023 to answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Milkmen Design, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Five Below, Inc. on 2/17/2023, filed on behalf of Milkmen Design, LLC. Related document(s) 8 , #4 . (S,T) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon 1616 Holdings, Inc. on 2/15/2023, filed on behalf of plaintiff Milkmen Design, LLC Related document(s) 8 , #4 . (S,T) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service by personal service executed upon DGL Group Ltd. on 2/1/2023, filed on behalf of Milkmen Design, LLC (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • Docket(#8) Service by Clerk. Summons, Complaint and Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge form addressed to 1616 Holdings, Inc., and Five Below, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 1616 Holdings 7020 0090 0001 4429 2381 and Five Below, Inc. 7020 0090 0001 4429 2374. (S,T) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Appearance by James F. McCarthy, III filed on behalf of Milkmen Design, LLC. (McCarthy, James) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketThis action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (S,T) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Errata to Plaintiff Milkmen Design, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Milkmen Design, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Revised Page of Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Annotated Page Identifying Error)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Witness List, #2 Exhibit B: Exhibit List) (S,T) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,T) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (S,T) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketJudge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (S,T) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Milkmen Design, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Milkmen Design, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint for patent infringement with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11808063. Filed by Milkmen Design, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USD899196, #2 Exhibit B - US10967776, #3 Exhibit C - USD960653, #4 Exhibit D - USD960654, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - DGL Group Ltd, #7 Summons - Five Below, Inc., #8 Summons - 1616 Holdings, Inc.) (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less