Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/16/2021 at 08:12:34 (UTC).

Milhouse v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Milhouse filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Robinhood Financial LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Altonaga. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-21446

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Milhouse

Defendants

Robinhood Markets, Inc.

Robinhood Financial LLC

Robinhood Securities, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eve-Lynn J. Rapp

Attorney at Edelson PC

350 North Lasalle Street, 14Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#70

(#13) SEVENTH ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#9

(#9) TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Florida the electronic record (bg, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#8

(#8) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Southern District of Florida. (bg, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mark Milhouse. Robinhood Securities, LLC waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Rapp, Eve -Lynn) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mark Milhouse. Robinhood Markets, Inc. waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Rapp, Eve -Lynn) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mark Milhouse. Robinhood Financial LLC waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Rapp, Eve -Lynn) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Milhouse by Eve -Lynn J. Rapp (Rapp, Eve -Lynn) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rapp, Eve -Lynn) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mark Milhouse; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18050493.(Rapp, Eve -Lynn) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SEVENTH ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#12) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Illinois. Case Number 1:21-cv-01601 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21446-CMA on 4/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#11) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (mc) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case transferred in from Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-01601. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Florida the electronic record (bg, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2989 Conditional Transfer Order filed 4/13/2021 (bg, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Southern District of Florida. (bg, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial tracking status hearing set for 06/04/2021 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 05/28/2021. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, ) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mark Milhouse. Robinhood Securities, LLC waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Rapp, Eve -Lynn) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mark Milhouse. Robinhood Markets, Inc. waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Rapp, Eve -Lynn) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mark Milhouse. Robinhood Financial LLC waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Rapp, Eve -Lynn) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Milhouse by Eve -Lynn J. Rapp (Rapp, Eve -Lynn) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rapp, Eve -Lynn) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mark Milhouse; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18050493.(Rapp, Eve -Lynn) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robinhood Securities, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Robinhood Markets, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eve-Lynn J. Rapp