This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/24/2021 at 10:17:20 (UTC).

Milestone IP LLC v. Frost Bank

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Milestone IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Frost Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01087

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Milestone IP LLC

Defendant

Frost Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

100 Congress Ave, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Franklin D. Kang

Attorney at Global Law & IP, PC

25521 Prado De Oro

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant Attorneys

Christa Brown-Sanford

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Syed K. Fareed

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P.

98 San Jacinto, Suite 1500

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Frost Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christa Brown-Sanford on behalf of Frost Bank. Attorney Christa Brown-Sanford added to party Frost Bank(pty:dft) (Brown-Sanford, Christa) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Syed K. Fareed on behalf of Frost Bank. Attorney Syed K. Fareed added to party Frost Bank(pty:dft) (Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14224913) by on behalf of Milestone IP LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#6

(#6) Pro Hac Vice Letter for Franklin D. Kang, Esq. (bw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Frost Bank. (bw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Milestone IP LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14223736), filed by Milestone IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCase Stayed (am) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Stay Case. Considering this is a joint motion, the Court GRANTS the Motion to Stay Case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JZ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Frost Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Frost Bank answer due 2/8/2021. (lad) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Frost Bank to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until and including February 8, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Frost Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christa Brown-Sanford on behalf of Frost Bank. Attorney Christa Brown-Sanford added to party Frost Bank(pty:dft) (Brown-Sanford, Christa) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Syed K. Fareed on behalf of Frost Bank. Attorney Syed K. Fareed added to party Frost Bank(pty:dft) (Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Franklin D. Kang for Milestone IP LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14224913) by on behalf of Milestone IP LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Pro Hac Vice Letter for Franklin D. Kang, Esq. (bw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Frost Bank. (bw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Milestone IP LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Milestone IP LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14223736), filed by Milestone IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Milestone IP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Frost Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond W Mort, III