This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/01/2019 at 08:11:29 (UTC).

Miles v. Rhode Island School of Design

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 Miles filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Rhode Island School of Design. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00519

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Miles

Petitioner

George Smith

Defendant

Rhode Island School of Design

Interested Parties

Jane Doe

Mary Roe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Richard Ratcliffe

Attorney at Ratcliffe Harten Galamaga LLP

40 Westminster Street, Suite 700, 331-3400, Fax: 331-3440

Providence, RI 02903

Gregory E. Henninger

Attorney at Ratcliffe Harten Galamaga, LLP

40 Westminster Street

Providence, RI 02903

Petitioner Attorney

Rajaram Suryanarayan

Attorney at Gunning & LaFazia, Inc.

33 College Hill Road, Suite 25B, 521-6900, Fax: 521-6901

Warwick, RI 02886

Defendant Attorney

Steven M. Richard

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

One Citizens Plaza, 5Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Interested Party Attorneys

Melissa M. Horne

Attorney at Higgins, Cavanagh & Cooney LLP

10 Dorrance Street, Suite 400

Providence, RI 02903

Gregory N. Hoffman

Attorney at Barton Gilman LLP

One Financial Plaza, 18Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Supporting Memorandum

#25

#24

23 #1

Supporting Memorandum Memorandum

#23

#18

17 #2

Exhibit A

17 #1

Supporting Memorandum Memorandum

#15

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit Appeal Outcome

1 #6

Exhibit John's Appeal

1 #5

Exhibit RISD Conduct Board Outcome

1 #4

Exhibit Mary's Supplemental Statement

1 #3

Exhibit John's Statement

1 #1

Exhibit RISD Code of Student Conduct

#1

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Status Conference held on 11/25/2019; counsel present: R. Ratcliffe, G. Henninger; S. Richard. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketUPDATED Notice of Status Conference RE-SCHEDULED to Monday 11/25/2019 at 4:00 PM in Chambers before Chief Judge William E. Smith; this conference will remain on the same date but the start time of the conference has been moved from 2:30 PM to 4 PM. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Mary Roe. Responses due by 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Hoffman, Gregory) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa M. Horne on behalf of Jane Doe (Horne, Melissa) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Protective Order filed by George Smith. Responses due by 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum)(Suryanarayan, Rajaram) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER denying as moot #15 Motion to Quash, #17 Motion to Quash, and #18 Motion to Quash. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/18/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER Entering #21 Stipulation and Protective Order filed by John Miles. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/18/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) Modified on 11/18/2019 (Jackson, Ryan). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Proposed STIPULATION and Protective Order filed by John Miles. (Ratcliffe, J.) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, by Rhode Island School of Design.(Richard, Steven) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Telephone Conference held on 10/31/2019; J. Richard Ratcliffe, Steven M. Richard, Gregory N. Hoffman and Rajaram Suryanarayan participated (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Miles. Responses due by 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Ratcliffe, J.) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym filed by John Miles. Responses due by 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Ratcliffe, J.) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1422498 ), filed by John Miles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RISD Code of Student Conduct, #2 Exhibit Mary's Report, #3 Exhibit John's Statement, #4 Exhibit Mary's Supplemental Statement, #5 Exhibit RISD Conduct Board Outcome, #6 Exhibit John's Appeal, #7 Exhibit Appeal Outcome, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Ratcliffe, J.) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Seal Identity Filed. Notice Sent To: John Miles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ratcliffe, J.) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s). (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Rhode Island School of Design. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Miles. Responses due by 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Ratcliffe, J.) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym filed by John Miles. Responses due by 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Ratcliffe, J.) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1422498 ), filed by John Miles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RISD Code of Student Conduct, #2 Exhibit Mary's Report, #3 Exhibit John's Statement, #4 Exhibit Mary's Supplemental Statement, #5 Exhibit RISD Conduct Board Outcome, #6 Exhibit John's Appeal, #7 Exhibit Appeal Outcome, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Ratcliffe, J.) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less