This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2021 at 09:22:28 (UTC).

Milan-Williams v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Milan-Williams filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul G. Byron and Gregory J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01140

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randall C. Milan-Williams

Defendant

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory D. Swartwood

Attorney at Nation Law Firm

570 Crown Oak Centre Dr

Longwood, FL 32750-6187

Defendant Attorney

William Cleveland Acree, II

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A.

255 S. Orange Avenue, Ste. 900

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Acree, William) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#20

(#20) (WRONG EVENT CODE) NOTICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America of Pendency of Other Actions (Acree, William) Modified on 8/24/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Initial Order by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Acree, William) Modified on 8/24/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance and Notice of Change of Address and Contact Information Appearance by William Cleveland Acree, II on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Acree, William) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#15

(#15) Amended Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Acree, William) Text modified on 8/11/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#13

(#13) (WRONG EVENT CODE. VOICEMAIL LEFT FOR ATTORNEY) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Acree, William) Modified on 8/11/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#12

(#12) (WRONG EVENT CODE. VOICEMAIL LEFT FOR ATTORNEY) NOTICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America Pendency of Other Actions (Acree, William) Modified on 8/11/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#11

(#14) ENDORSED ORDER denying #11 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT for failure to comply with the type size requirements in Local Rule 1.08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/10/2021. (MB) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

1 #11

Proposed Summons

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit I - work agmt

1 #8

Exhibit H - 11-19-210 letter

1 #7

Exhibit G - 9-3-20 letter

1 #6

Exhibit F - 1-9-20 letter

1 #5

Exhibit E - 9-9-19 letter

1 #4

Exhibit D - 6-13-19 letter

1 #3

Exhibit C - 4-19-19 letter

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Acree, William) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) (WRONG EVENT CODE) NOTICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America of Pendency of Other Actions (Acree, William) Modified on 8/24/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Initial Order by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Acree, William) Modified on 8/24/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE to counsel Matthew A. Jordan of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RDO) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance and Notice of Change of Address and Contact Information Appearance by William Cleveland Acree, II on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Acree, William) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 DEFENDANT'S AMENDED UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. The Prudential Insurance Company of America's answer or response due 9/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/12/2021. (MB) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Amended Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Acree, William) Text modified on 8/11/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENDORSED ORDER denying #11 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT for failure to comply with the type size requirements in Local Rule 1.08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 8/10/2021. (MB) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) (WRONG EVENT CODE. VOICEMAIL LEFT FOR ATTORNEY) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Acree, William) Modified on 8/11/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) (WRONG EVENT CODE. VOICEMAIL LEFT FOR ATTORNEY) NOTICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America Pendency of Other Actions (Acree, William) Modified on 8/11/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN of service executed on 7/29/2021 by Randall C. Milan-Williams as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Randall C. Milan-Williams. (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Randall C. Milan-Williams. Related case(s): No (Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (RDO) (RDO). (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER regarding ERISA Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/13/2021. (MB) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docket(#5) Entered in Error (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/13/2021. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/13/2021. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-1140-PGB-GJK. (SJB) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18462115) filed by Randall C. Milan-Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - address, #2 Exhibit B - policy, #3 Exhibit C - 4-19-19 letter, #4 Exhibit D - 6-13-19 letter, #5 Exhibit E - 9-9-19 letter, #6 Exhibit F - 1-9-20 letter, #7 Exhibit G - 9-3-20 letter, #8 Exhibit H - 11-19-210 letter, #9 Exhibit I - work agmt, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Proposed Summons)(Swartwood, Gregory) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Cleveland Acree, II