This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2023 at 07:20:05 (UTC).

MIKOS v. CAMPOS-PORTILLO

Case Summary

On 03/29/2023 MIKOS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CAMPOS-PORTILLO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01207

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAWRENCE MIKOS

Defendants

ASTUL CAMPOS-PORTILLO

PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE

STATE FARM

PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN S. RIECHELSON

Defendant Attorneys

JAMES WILLING WATSON

KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS

CHRISTEN RAFUSE

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Astul Campos-Portillo, Plymouth Rock Assurance, Progressive Insurance, State Farm ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16592222.), filed by Lawrence Mikos.(RIECHELSON, KEVIN) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by LAWRENCE MIKOS Complaint (RIECHELSON, KEVIN) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to ASTUL CAMPOS-PORTILLO, PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE, STATE FARM. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 3/31/23 (JL) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#4

(#4) 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS on behalf of STATE FARM (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LAWRENCE MIKOS. PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE waiver sent on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (RIECHELSON, KEVIN) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTEN RAFUSE on behalf of PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE (RAFUSE, CHRISTEN) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION /Severing Bad faith Claims Against Plymouth Rock by PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE. (RAFUSE, CHRISTEN) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES WILLING WATSON on behalf of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(WATSON, JAMES) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

#10

(#10) CONSENT AND ORDER THAT PARAGRAPHS 63 THROUGH 73 OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ASSERTING A BAD FAITH CLAIM AGAINST PLYMOUTH ROCK BE AND HEREBY ARE SEVERED AND SUCH CLAIMS ARE TOLLED AND STAYED PENDING ADJUDICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIMS AGAINST PLYMOUTH ROCK AS ASSERTED IN THE REMAINDER OF THE COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/23/23. 5/23/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint together with and Affirmative Defenses by PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE.(RAFUSE, CHRISTEN) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#12

(#12) Statement /RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE. (RAFUSE, CHRISTEN) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES WILLING WATSON on behalf of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(WATSON, JAMES) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION SEVERING BAD FAITH CLAIMS AGAINST STATE FARM INDEMNITY COMPANY, INCORRECTLY DESIGNATED AS STATE FARM by STATE FARM. (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION SEVERING BAD FAITH CLAIMS AGAINST STATE FARM INDEMNITY COMPANY, INCORRECTLY DESIGNATED AS STATE FARM by STATE FARM. (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES WILLING WATSON on behalf of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(WATSON, JAMES) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Statement /RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE. (RAFUSE, CHRISTEN) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint together with and Affirmative Defenses by PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE.(RAFUSE, CHRISTEN) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT AND ORDER THAT PARAGRAPHS 63 THROUGH 73 OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ASSERTING A BAD FAITH CLAIM AGAINST PLYMOUTH ROCK BE AND HEREBY ARE SEVERED AND SUCH CLAIMS ARE TOLLED AND STAYED PENDING ADJUDICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIMS AGAINST PLYMOUTH ROCK AS ASSERTED IN THE REMAINDER OF THE COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/23/23. 5/23/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES WILLING WATSON on behalf of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(WATSON, JAMES) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION /Severing Bad faith Claims Against Plymouth Rock by PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE. (RAFUSE, CHRISTEN) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTEN RAFUSE on behalf of PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE (RAFUSE, CHRISTEN) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LAWRENCE MIKOS. PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE waiver sent on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (RIECHELSON, KEVIN) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS on behalf of STATE FARM (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to ASTUL CAMPOS-PORTILLO, PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE, PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE, STATE FARM. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 3/31/23 (JL) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by LAWRENCE MIKOS Complaint (RIECHELSON, KEVIN) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketAttorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED CIVIL COVER SHEET AND DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. On the Designation Form, two boxes are checked off in the Civil Box while the Civil Cover Sheet has two Natures of Suit selected. You can only pick one on each form. (sbt) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Astul Campos-Portillo, Plymouth Rock Assurance, Progressive Insurance, State Farm ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16592222.), filed by Lawrence Mikos.(RIECHELSON, KEVIN) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less