This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2022 at 10:17:21 (UTC).

Mikhail v. The Procter & Gamble Company

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Mikhail filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against The Procter Gamble Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joanna Seybert and Steven I. Locke. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03602

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joanna Seybert

Referral Judge

Steven I. Locke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amgad S. Mikhail

Defendant

The Procter & Gamble Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adilya Rishatovna Gambone

Attorney at Gambone Law Group, PLLC

91-31 Queens Blvd., Suite 318

Elmhurst, NY 11373

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Procter & Gamble Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15673524 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by AMGAD S MIKHAIL. (Gambone, Adilya) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. by AMGAD S MIKHAIL (Gambone, Adilya) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. by AMGAD S MIKHAIL (Gambone, Adilya) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#4

No Description Available

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to The Procter & Gamble Company. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#7

(#7) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 2) IN RE: PROCTER & GAMBLE AEROSOL PRODUCTS MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of April 7, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Michael H. Watson. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 2) IN RE: PROCTER & GAMBLE AEROSOL PRODUCTS MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of April 7, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Michael H. Watson. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCase transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Southern District of Ohio as case 2:22-cv-02703, filed 07/07/2022. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCase transferred to District of Southern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 2) IN RE: PROCTER & GAMBLE AEROSOL PRODUCTS MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of April 7, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Michael H. Watson. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 2) IN RE: PROCTER & GAMBLE AEROSOL PRODUCTS MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of April 7, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Michael H. Watson. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to The Procter & Gamble Company. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2022: #1 Additional Corrections) (Jakubowski, Laura). (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. by AMGAD S MIKHAIL (Gambone, Adilya) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. by AMGAD S MIKHAIL (Gambone, Adilya) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Procter & Gamble Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15673524 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by AMGAD S MIKHAIL. (Gambone, Adilya) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY is a litigant