This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 15:43:57 (UTC).

LOCKETT V. SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2019 LOCKETT filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE and WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00706

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIKEENA LOCKETT ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF HOWARD HAIRSTON

MIKEENA LOCKETT

Defendants

SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC D/B/A BRIAN CENTER HEALTH & REHABILITATION/EDEN

ALISA BRADFORD

SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC

SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC doing business as BRIAN CENTER HEALTH & REHABILITATION/EDEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER JAMES ANGLIN

Attorney at ANGLIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

3824 Barrett Dr., Ste. 301

Raleigh, NC 27609

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL E. PHILLIPS

Attorney at HAGWOOD ADELMAN TIPTON, PC

4735 Old Canton Rd., Ste. 111

Jackson, MS 39211

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Exhibit Letter to P to send facility records

#18

#17

16 #2

Exhibit Dispute Resolution Program Agreement

16 #1

Exhibit Complaint filed 4.22.19

#16

#15

#14

#13

1 #8

Exhibit 8-Plaintiff's RFA

1 #7

Exhibit 7-Complaint 4.22.19

1 #6

Exhibit 6- Summons Original Complaint

1 #5

Exhibit 5-State Court File

1 #4

Exhibit 4-Summons

1 #3

Exhibit 3-Affidavit of Bradford

1 #2

Exhibit 2-Affidavit of Sims

1 #1

Exhibit 1-Complaint

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY, filed by Defendant ALISA BRADFORD, to Response to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment Rebuttal Memorandum in Support of Alisa Bradford's filed by ALISA BRADFORD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to P to send facility records)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants ALISA BRADFORD, SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC re #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings In Support of filed by ALISA BRADFORD, SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by ALISA BRADFORD, SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint filed 4.22.19, #2 Exhibit Dispute Resolution Program Agreement)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) First MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Law by MIKEENA LOCKETT. Response to Motion due by 9/6/2019 (ANGLIN, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE Memorandum filed by Plaintiff MIKEENA LOCKETT re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ALISA BRADFORD filed by MIKEENA LOCKETT. Replies due by 8/22/2019 (ANGLIN, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff MIKEENA LOCKETT (ANGLIN, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER JAMES ANGLIN on behalf of Plaintiff MIKEENA LOCKETT (ANGLIN, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Petition for Removal,, Exhibit 5 Certified State Court File by Defendant SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corrected document re #8 Memorandum,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of A. Bradford)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALISA BRADFORD. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant ALISA BRADFORD re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment In Support of filed by ALISA BRADFORD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Bradford)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment by ALISA BRADFORD. Response to Motion due by 8/8/2019 (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #4 Complaint, with Jury Demand by SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. (PHILLIPS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to ALISA BRADFORD, SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. (Original document issued in Rockingham County Superior Court Case Number 19CVS1158 on 04/22/2019 and is listed as Exhibit 4 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC by SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC.(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against ALISA BRADFORD, SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, filed by MIKEENA LOCKETT. (Original document filed in Rockingham County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS1158 and is listed as Exhibit 1 and 7 to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by ALISA BRADFORD re #1 Petition for Removal,, Consent to and Joinder in Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Affidavit)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL against MIKEENA LOCKETT ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF HOWARD HAIRSTON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2612316.), filed by SSC EDEN OPERATING COMPANY, LLC D/B/A BRIAN CENTER HEALTH & REHABILITATION/EDEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Affidavit of Sims, #3 Exhibit 3-Affidavit of Bradford, #4 Exhibit 4-Summons, #5 Exhibit 5-State Court File, #6 Exhibit 6- Summons Original Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7-Complaint 4.22.19, #8 Exhibit 8-Plaintiff's RFA, #9 Exhibit 9-Plaintiff's RFP, #10 Exhibit 10-Plaintiff's ROGs, #11 Exhibit 11-Subpoena)(PHILLIPS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SSC CONCORD OPERATING COMPANY, LLC D/B/A BRIAN CENTER HEALTH & RETIREMENT/CABARRUS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER JAMES ANGLIN