This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2021 at 09:07:03 (UTC).

Mihalich v. City of Eugene et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Mihalich filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Eugene. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. McShane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00142

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. McShane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Isabel M. Mihalich

Defendants

Officer David Clark

City of Eugene

Officer Tyler Tremain

Officer Matthew Twite

Chief Chris Skinner

Sergeant Jessica Dalton

Sergeant Carlos Jones

Officer Ryan Underwood

Tyler L. Tremain

Ryan J. Underwood

Chris Skinner

Matthew D. Twite

Jessica D. Dalton

David F. Clark

Carlos M. Jones

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert A. Miller

Attorney at Law Office of Robert Miller

2260 Oakmont Way, Suite 7

Eugene, OR 97401

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendants' Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by Isabel M. Mihalich. (Miller, Robert) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued Electronically as to Tyler L. Tremain. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued Electronically as to Chris Skinner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued Electronically as to Ryan J. Underwood. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued Electronically as to Matthew D. Twite. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to Jessica D. Dalton. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to David F. Clark. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Carlos M. Jones. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to City of Eugene. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/1/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/28/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 6/28/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7840206. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Isabel M. Mihalich against Isabel M. Mihalich (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Miller, Robert) Modified on 1/29/2021 to add payment information. (eo) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert A. Miller