This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2019 at 07:49:33 (UTC).

Migues v. We Care Homes Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2019 Migues filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against We Care Homes Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael J Juneau and Patrick J Hanna. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00976

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J Juneau

Referral Judge

Patrick J Hanna

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nellie Migues

Samantha Miguez

Ashley Walker

Defendants

We Care Homes Inc

Kyle Jones

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Earl Brady

Attorney at Bohrer Law Firm

8712 Jefferson Hwy Ste B

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Philip Bohrer

Attorney at Bohrer Law Firm

8712 Jefferson Hwy Ste B

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Defendant Attorney

Timothy W Basden

Attorney at Breaud & Meyers

P O Box 3448

Lafayette, LA 70502

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Memo In Support of Motion to Certify Class with Table of Contents & Authorities filed by Nellie Migues, Samantha Miguez, Ashley Walker regarding #9 MOTION to Certify Class . (aty,Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 9/23/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Deficiency to Philip Bohrer on behalf of Nellie Migues, Samantha Miguez, Ashley Walker regarding #9 MOTION to Certify Class . Reason: A table of contents and table of cases, statutes and other authorities is required for a brief which exceeds ten pages. Please see LR7.8 for specific requirements regarding table of contents. (crt,JonesSld, P) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #9 MOTION to Certify Class . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion day set for 11/14/2019 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,JonesSld, P) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

9 #11

Proposed order

9 #10

Exhibit

9 #9

Exhibit

9 #8

Exhibit

9 #7

Exhibit

9 #6

Exhibit

9 #5

Exhibit

9 #4

Exhibit

9 #3

Exhibit

9 #2

Exhibit

9 #1

Memorandum / Brief

#9

(#9) MOTION to Certify Class by Nellie Migues, Samantha Miguez, Ashley Walker. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Proposed order)(aty,Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 9/20/2019 to indicate a deficiency (JonesSld, P). Modified on 9/23/2019 to remove deficiency and indicate SEE #12 Corrective Document, Memorandum with Table of Contents & Authorities (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 09/20/2019)

8 #1

Exhibit Consent Form of Samantha Miguez

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Nellie Migues, Ashley Walker of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form of Samantha Miguez)(aty,Bohrer, Philip) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by We Care Homes Inc. (aty,Basden, Timothy) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Memo In Support of Motion to Certify Class with Table of Contents & Authorities filed by Nellie Migues, Samantha Miguez, Ashley Walker regarding #9 MOTION to Certify Class . (aty,Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 9/23/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Deficiency to Philip Bohrer on behalf of Nellie Migues, Samantha Miguez, Ashley Walker regarding #9 MOTION to Certify Class . Reason: A table of contents and table of cases, statutes and other authorities is required for a brief which exceeds ten pages. Please see LR7.8 for specific requirements regarding table of contents. (crt,JonesSld, P) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #9 MOTION to Certify Class . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion day set for 11/14/2019 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,JonesSld, P) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Certify Class by Nellie Migues, Samantha Miguez, Ashley Walker. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Proposed order)(aty,Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 9/20/2019 to indicate a deficiency (JonesSld, P). Modified on 9/23/2019 to remove deficiency and indicate SEE #12 Corrective Document, Memorandum with Table of Contents & Authorities (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Nellie Migues, Ashley Walker of Filing Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form of Samantha Miguez)(aty,Bohrer, Philip) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by We Care Homes Inc. (aty,Basden, Timothy) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Kyle Jones, We Care Homes Inc.(Attorney Timothy W Basden added to party Kyle Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy W Basden added to party We Care Homes Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Basden, Timothy) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by Nellie Migues of Filing Consent to Sue by Ashley Walker (Attachments: #1 Consent Form of Ashley Walker)(aty,Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 9/4/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nellie Migues. Kyle Jones served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; We Care Homes Inc served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY TO CAPTURE ANSWER DUE DATE, SEE PDF ATTACHED TO DOCUMENTS #3 & #4 . (crt,JonesSld, P) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on We Care Homes, Inc. on 08/05/2019, filed by Nellie Migues. Answer due 8/26/2019. (aty,Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 8/15/2019 to add answer due date (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Kyle Jones on 08/05/2019, filed by Nellie Migues. Answer due 8/26/2019. (aty,Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 8/15/2019 to add answer due date (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kyle Jones, We Care Homes Inc (crt,JonesSld, P) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,JonesSld, P) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Kyle Jones, We Care Homes Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4010096) filed by Nellie Migues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil cover sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Nellie Migues(pty:pla))(aty,Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 7/30/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P). (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy W Basden(Designation Retained)