This case was last updated from PACER on 10/10/2020 at 08:29:16 (UTC).

Miguel Soto v. Javier F. Serrato et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Miguel Soto filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Javier F Serrato. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John D. Early and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01487

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John D. Early

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miguel Soto

Defendants

Javier F. Serrato

Does 1 to 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason J Kim

Attorney at So Cal Equal Access Group

101 South Western Avenue 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90004

Jason T Yoon

Attorney at So Cal Equal Access Group

101 South Western Avenue 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90004

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Declaration

#14

(#14) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Javier F. Serrato filed by Plaintiff Miguel Soto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFFS UNRUH ACT AND NEGLIGENCE CLAIMS #11 . Those claims are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff asserting them in state court. The Court retains jurisdiction over Plaintiffs ADA claim by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (lc) Modified on 9/2/2020 (lc). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

11 #2

Declaration

11 #1

Declaration

#11

(#11) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Miguel Sototo Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #9 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#9

(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THIS COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFFS UNRUH ACT CLAIM AND OTHER STATE LAW CLAIMS. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2020.) (twdb) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Javier F. Serrato. (lh) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 MIGUEL SOTO. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MIGUEL SOTO. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27583097 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party MIGUEL SOTO(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Javier F. Serrato filed by Plaintiff Miguel Soto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Miguel Soto, upon Defendant Javier F. Serrato served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Javier F. Serrato in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFFS UNRUH ACT AND NEGLIGENCE CLAIMS #11 . Those claims are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff asserting them in state court. The Court retains jurisdiction over Plaintiffs ADA claim by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (lc) Modified on 9/2/2020 (lc). (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Miguel Sototo Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #9 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THIS COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFFS UNRUH ACT CLAIM AND OTHER STATE LAW CLAIMS. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2020.) (twdb) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Javier F. Serrato. (lh) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 MIGUEL SOTO. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MIGUEL SOTO. (Kim, Jason) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27583097 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party MIGUEL SOTO(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less