This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/15/2021 at 09:57:04 (UTC).

Miguel, Jr. v. Walmart Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 Miguel, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH J. MANSFIELD and DERRICK K. WATSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00276

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

Presiding Judge

DERRICK K. WATSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benjamin Miguel, Jr.

Defendants

Doe Government Entities 1-10

Jane Does 1-10

John Does 1-10

Walmart, Inc.

Doe Partnerships 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Glenn Tadaomi Honda, Jr.

1260 Young St Suite 228

Honolulu, HI 96814

George Cesar Alejandro

Palm Wave Building

1260 Young Street, SU 228

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J. Nakano

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

Shawn L.M. Benton

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

Normand R. Lezy

Attorney at Cox, Wootton, Lerner, Griffin & Hansen LLP

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1099

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures

#3

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Exhibit B

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart, Inc. (Amended Notice of Depositions Upon Written Interrogatories-Kaiser; Hawaiian Properties) (Benton, Shawn) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart, Inc. (Notice of Depositions Upon Written Interrogatories-Kaiser; Hawaiian Properties) (Benton, Shawn) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart, Inc. (Notice of Depositions Upon Written Interrogatories-Kaiser; Hawaiian Properties) (Benton, Shawn) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Miguel, Jr. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and Response to Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents (Honda, Glenn) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Plaintiff's First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant. (Honda, Glenn) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Benjamin Miguel, Jr.. (Honda, Glenn) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on July 20, 2021. (bbb) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 07/18/2022 at 8:30 a.m. in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference is set for 06/07/2022 at 9:45 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 11/10/2021 at 10:00 a.m. by Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 04/13/2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 02/16/2022. Discovery due by 05/20/2022. The Courtroom Manager will be sending out a separate email providing counsel detailed instructions regarding Early Settlement Conferences Video Tele-Conference (VTC) access prior to the conference date.Until further notice, all other hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668(AT&T Service / 9:35 - 9:41) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EO: The #3 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 07/19/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD will be held via telephone. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart, Inc. (First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff) (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Scheduling Conference Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc.. (Lezy, Normand) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement. (Honda, Glenn) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS REPORT Joint Report of the Rule 26(f) Conference of the Parties by Benjamin Miguel, Jr.. (Honda, Glenn) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV-21-0000640. (emt, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 7/19/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00276 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings.(jni) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from First Circuit Court, case number 1CCV-21-0000640. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2540362), filed by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, 1CCV-21-0000640, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial, 1CCV-21-0000640 , #3 Certificate of Service)(Lezy, Normand) Modified on 6/18/2021 (emt, ). (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn L.M. Benton