This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2022 at 08:41:00 (UTC).

Miera v. Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 Miera filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kea W. Riggs and Stephan M. Vidmar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01227

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kea W. Riggs

Referral Judge

Stephan M. Vidmar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gabriel Miera

Defendants

Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC

New Mexico Corrections Department

Penitentiary of New Mexico

Mary Gallegos

Jessica Herrera

Pat Lovato

FNU Warden

FNU Rios

FNU Baca

CNMCF Classsification Officer

Gary French

Benjamin Huang

Ellen Whittman

Kathy Bustos

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth M. Piazza

Attorney at Guebert Gentile & Piazza P.C.

P.O. Box 93880, 87199

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Julia H. Purdy

Attorney at Guebert Gentile Piazza Pc

6801 Jefferson Ne, Ste 400

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Robert Gentile

Attorney at Guebert Bruckner PC

P.O. Box 93880

Albuquerque, NM 87199

Terry R. Guebert

Attorney at Guebert Gentile & Piazza P.C.

P.O. Box 93880

Albuquerque, NM 87199-3880

Parrish Collins

P. O. Box 506

Albuquerque, NM 87103-0506

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF GARY FRENCH, M.D., ELLEN WITTMAN, PA, KATHY BUSTOS, LPN, MARY GALLEGOS, JESSICA HERRERA, PAT LOVATO, PNM DEPUTY WARDEN, PNM CAPTAIN RIOS, PNM CAPTAIN BACA, AND CNMCF CLASSIFICATION OFFICER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Plaintiff's 1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Gary French, M.D.; Ellen Wittman, PA; Kathy Bustos, LPN; Mary Gallegos; Jessica Herrera; Pat Lovato; PNM Deputy Warden; PNM Captain Rios; PNM Captain Baca; and CNMCF Classification Officer. Each party SHALL BEAR its own costs and attorney's fees. (ve) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice as to Gary French, M.D., Ellen Wittman, PA, Kathy Bustos, LPN, Mary Gallegos, Jessica Herrera, Pat Lovato, PNM Deputy Warden, PNM Captain Rios, PNM Captain Baca, and CNMCF Classification Officer by Kathy Bustos, Gary French, Ellen Whittman. (Park, Alfred) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Miera. Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC served on 1/8/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Gentile, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Miera. New Mexico Corrections Department served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Gentile, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Miera. Penitentiary of New Mexico served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Gentile, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

2 #21

Exhibit

2 #20

Exhibit

2 #17

Exhibit

2 #16

Exhibit

2 #14

Exhibit

2 #13

Exhibit

2 #11

Exhibit

2 #10

Exhibit

2 #9

Exhibit

2 #7

Exhibit

2 #3

Exhibit

2 #2

Exhibit

2 #2

Main Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF GARY FRENCH, M.D., ELLEN WITTMAN, PA, KATHY BUSTOS, LPN, MARY GALLEGOS, JESSICA HERRERA, PAT LOVATO, PNM DEPUTY WARDEN, PNM CAPTAIN RIOS, PNM CAPTAIN BACA, AND CNMCF CLASSIFICATION OFFICER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Plaintiff's 1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Gary French, M.D.; Ellen Wittman, PA; Kathy Bustos, LPN; Mary Gallegos; Jessica Herrera; Pat Lovato; PNM Deputy Warden; PNM Captain Rios; PNM Captain Baca; and CNMCF Classification Officer. Each party SHALL BEAR its own costs and attorney's fees. (ve) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party with Prejudice as to Gary French, M.D., Ellen Wittman, PA, Kathy Bustos, LPN, Mary Gallegos, Jessica Herrera, Pat Lovato, PNM Deputy Warden, PNM Captain Rios, PNM Captain Baca, and CNMCF Classification Officer by Kathy Bustos, Gary French, Ellen Whittman. (Park, Alfred) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued on Amended Complaint as to Kathy Bustos, Gary French, Ellen Whittman. (jg) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Miera. Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC served on 1/8/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Gentile, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Miera. New Mexico Corrections Department served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Gentile, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Miera. Penitentiary of New Mexico served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Gentile, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, New Mexico Corrections Department, Penitentiary of New Mexico, Hector Balderas. (jg) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand For Jury [Redacted} against All Defendants., filed by Gabriel Miera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit)(Collins, Parrish) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketUnited States District Judge Kea W. Riggs and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (dr) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8053120 re 1 Complaint,, filed by Gabriel Miera (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Collins, Parrish) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where New Mexico Corrections Department (NMCD) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Parrish Collins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Gentile