This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/18/2022 at 08:12:16 (UTC).

Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Waterfront, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Waterfront, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg Kays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00250

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Kays

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Waterfront, Inc

Mark Trosen

Rhonda Trosen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Stephen James Moore

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Lawrence F. Gepford, Jr.

David M. Halphin

George E. Kapke, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Stephen James Moore on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company.(Moore, Stephen) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Counterclaim on behalf of Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company.(Moore, Stephen) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

13 #1

MAP General Order

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 7/1/2022. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/15/2022. Signed on 5/31/22 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of appearance by George E. Kapke, Jr on behalf of Mark Trosen, Rhonda Trosen (Kapke, George) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#10

(#10) Defendants Mark & Rhonda Trosen's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Mark Trosen, Rhonda Trosen.(Attorney George E. Kapke, Jr added to party Mark Trosen(pty:dft), Attorney George E. Kapke, Jr added to party Rhonda Trosen(pty:dft))(Kapke, George) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#9

(#9) Defendant Waterfront, Inc's. ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , First COUNTERCLAIM against Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company on behalf of Waterfront, Inc.(Gepford, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of appearance by David M. Halphin on behalf of Waterfront, Inc (Attorney David M. Halphin added to party Waterfront, Inc(pty:dft))(Halphin, David) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Lawrence F. Gepford, Jr on behalf of Waterfront, Inc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/31/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Lawrence F. Gepford, Jr added to party Waterfront, Inc(pty:dft))(Gepford, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. Waterfront, Inc served on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. (Moore, Stephen) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. Rhonda Trosen served on 4/30/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Moore, Stephen) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#3

(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. Mark Trosen served on 4/30/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Moore, Stephen) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Stephen James Moore on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company.(Moore, Stephen) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Counterclaim on behalf of Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company.(Moore, Stephen) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP reassignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 7/1/2022. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/15/2022. Signed on 5/31/22 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of appearance by George E. Kapke, Jr on behalf of Mark Trosen, Rhonda Trosen (Kapke, George) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendants Mark & Rhonda Trosen's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Mark Trosen, Rhonda Trosen.(Attorney George E. Kapke, Jr added to party Mark Trosen(pty:dft), Attorney George E. Kapke, Jr added to party Rhonda Trosen(pty:dft))(Kapke, George) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant Waterfront, Inc's. ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , First COUNTERCLAIM against Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company on behalf of Waterfront, Inc.(Gepford, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Waterfront, Inc's answer due 5/23/2022. Signed on 5/18/22 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of appearance by David M. Halphin on behalf of Waterfront, Inc (Attorney David M. Halphin added to party Waterfront, Inc(pty:dft))(Halphin, David) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Lawrence F. Gepford, Jr on behalf of Waterfront, Inc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/31/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Lawrence F. Gepford, Jr added to party Waterfront, Inc(pty:dft))(Gepford, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. Waterfront, Inc served on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. (Moore, Stephen) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. Rhonda Trosen served on 4/30/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Moore, Stephen) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. Mark Trosen served on 4/30/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (Moore, Stephen) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Trosen, Rhonda Trosen, Waterfront, Inc. (Crocker, Susan) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Cynthia A. Norton. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Crocker, Susan) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MARK TROSEN, Rhonda Trosen, Waterfront, Inc filed by Stephen James Moore on behalf of Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7894209. Service due by 7/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Stephen) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less