This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2019 at 08:59:52 (UTC).

Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC v. Xerox Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Xerox Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth A. Wolford. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06665

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth A. Wolford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Xerox Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Steven E. Cole

Attorney at Leclair Korona Cole LLP

28 E. Main Street, Suite 1500

Rochester, NY 14614

Jeremy M. Sher

Attorney at Leclair Korona Cole LLP

28 E. Main Street, Suite 1500

Rochester, NY 14614

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Douglas J. Nash

Attorney at Barclay Damon, LLP

125 East Jefferson Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

 

Court Documents

#10

3 #7

Text of Proposed Order

3 #4

Exhibit B

3 #3

Exhibit A

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Summons

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-Filing Notification re #10 ANSWER: This case has been consolidated with 19-CV-6036. All future filing/docketing should be done on 19-CV-6036 and not on this case. (JHF) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Xerox Corp.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment of Unenforceability of the '415, '425, and '582 Patents against Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC by Xerox Corporation.(Nash, Douglas) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • This case has been consolidated with 19-CV-6036. All future docketing should be done on 19-CV-6036. (JHF) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Consolidate. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2), the Court grants Plaintiff's unopposed motion to consolidate the instant matter into Civil Action Number 6:19-cv-6036. All future filings shall be made solely in Civil Action Number 6:19-cv-6036. The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate the cases and to administratively terminate the instant matter. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 09/26/2019. (CDH) -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Nash on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Nash, Douglas) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Xerox Corporation. (Nash, Douglas) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy M. Sher on behalf of Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC (Sher, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark Case sent to USPTO. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JHF) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Xerox Corporation. (TF) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Steven E. Cole, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Steven) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC identifying Corporate Parent Midwest Youth A & S, Inc. for Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC.. (Sher, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Xerox Corporation $ 400 receipt number 0209-3584763, filed by Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Summons, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cole, Steven) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where XEROX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Mack Sher