This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2019 at 07:34:52 (UTC).

Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC v. Xerox Corp.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Xerox Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Telesca, Elizabeth A. Wolford and Jonathan W. Feldman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06036

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jonathan W. Feldman

Presiding Judges

Michael A. Telesca

Elizabeth A. Wolford

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Xerox Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark A. Baghdassarian

Attorney at Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10037

James Hannah

Attorney at KRAMER, LEVIN LAW FIRM - MENLO PARK

990 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Cristina L. Martinez

Attorney at Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10037

Lisa Kobialka

Attorney at Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

990 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Daniel J. Fischer

Attorney at KOLEY JESSEN LAW FIRM

1125 South 103Rd Street, Suite 800, One Pacific Place

Omaha, NE 68124

Paul J. Andre

Attorney at KRAMER, LEVIN LAW FIRM - MENLO PARK

990 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Jeremy M. Sher

Attorney at Leclair Korona Cole LLP

28 E. Main Street, Suite 1500

Rochester, NY 14614

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jason S. Jackson

Attorney at KUTAK, ROCK LAW FIRM - OMAHA

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

Steven Cherny

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

William J. Hale

Attorney at GOOSMANN LAW FIRM - OMAHA

17838 Burke Street, Suite 250

Omaha, NE 68118

Carol A. Svolos

Attorney at KUTAK, ROCK LAW FIRM - OMAHA

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

William B. Wray

Attorney at KUTAK, ROCK LAW FIRM

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

Jeana L. Goosmann

Attorney at GOOSMANN LAW FIRM - SIOUX CITY

410 Fifth Street

Sioux City, IA 51101

David Nelson

Attorney at QUINN, EMANUEL LAW FIRM

191 North Wacker Drive, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60606

Eric Huang

Attorney at QUINN, EMANUEL LAW FIRM

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Joel M. Carney

Attorney at GOOSMANN LAW FIRM - OMAHA

17838 Burke Street, Suite 250

Omaha, NE 68118

John P. Passarelli

Attorney at KUTAK, ROCK LAW FIRM - OMAHA

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

David A. Nelson

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

191 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60606

Eric Hui-chieh Huang

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Robert M. Isackson

Attorney at Leason Ellis LLP

1 Barker Avenue, 5Th Floor

White Plains, NY 10601

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#94

#92

#91

#90

88 #3

Exhibit Attorney Oath

88 #2

Exhibit Sponsoring Affidavit

88 #1

Exhibit Petition

#88

#39

1 #20

Exhibit #20 - '239 Patent

1 #19

Exhibit #19 - '113 Patent

1 #17

Exhibit #17 - '089 Patent

1 #16

Exhibit #16 - '795 Patent

1 #15

Exhibit #15 - '255 Patent

1 #8

Exhibit #8 - '005 B2 Patent

1 #7

Exhibit #7 - '998 Patent

1 #4

Exhibit #4 - '756 Patent

#1

296 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) SCHEDULING/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Parties to submit to the Court the names of two potential special masters by 3/20/2019. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 3/11/19. (BJJ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Docket(#93) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman: Scheduling Conference held on 3/6/2019. Appearances: Cristina Martinez, Esq., via telephone, Mark Baghdassarian, Esq., Steven E. Cole, Esq. for plaintiff; Steven Cherny, Esq. and Douglas Nash, Esq. for defendant. The parties shall confer and submit, via email, a joint scheduling order in Word format pursuant to the discussion at the conference. The proposed order shall include 2 weeks for the parties to submit 2 names each for a special master. (BJJ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) ORDER re #39 : Per plaintiff's request, Cristina Martinez, Esq. may appear at conference via telephone. Counsel is directed to call the conference center at 703-724-3100. When prompted for the number you wish to dial, enter 4100019#. When prompted for the security pin, enter 9999#. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 3/6/19. (BJJ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Isackson on behalf of Xerox Corp. (Isackson, Robert) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) ORDER granting #88 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 3/1/19. (BJJ)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- Clerk to add David A. Nelson as pro hac vice counsel for defendants. (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) DISCOVERY PLAN by Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC.(Cole, Steven) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketClerk confirmed IL state bar admission for David A. Nelson. (JHF) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) MOTION to appear pro hac vice (DAVID AARON NELSON) ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-3370459.) by Xerox Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Exhibit Sponsoring Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Attorney Oath, #4 Exhibit Civility Principles Oath, #5 Exhibit ECF Registration, #6 Exhibit Attorney Database Information)(Nash, Douglas) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) ORDER granting #81 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting #82 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting #83 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting #85 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting #86 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 2/22/19. (BJJ)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-Clerk to add pro hac vice status to movant attorneys (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketClerk confirmed NY state bar admission for Steven Cherny. (JHF) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Mark A. Baghdassarian for Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. Fee in the amount of $100.00 paid, receipt number 8045468. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LAC) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.] (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Paul Andre for Plaintiff Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. Fee in the amount of $100.00 paid, receipt number 8045468. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LAC) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.] (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Joel M. Carney on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corporation (Carney, Joel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Jeana L. Goosmann on behalf of Defendant Xerox Corporation (Goosmann, Jeana) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a patent. Complaint filed on 12/13/2017. Notification sent to the U.S. Patent Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JAB) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to defendant Xerox Corporation regarding Complaint #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KMM) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Docket(#4) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (JAB) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Requested as to Xerox Corporation regarding Complaint,,,, #1 . (Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Midwest Youth A&S, Inc. for Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Plaintiffs Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC, Midwest Youth A&S, Inc..(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand For Patent Infringement against Xerox Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0867-3580909), by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 - '005 B1 Patent, #2 Exhibit #2 - '684 Patent, #3 Exhibit #3 - '314 Patent, #4 Exhibit #4 - '756 Patent, #5 Exhibit #5 - '974 Patent, #6 Exhibit #6 - '285 Patent, #7 Exhibit #7 - '998 Patent, #8 Exhibit #8 - '005 B2 Patent, #9 Exhibit #9 - '856 Patent, #10 Exhibit #10 - '278 Patent, #11 Exhibit #11 - '582 Patent, #12 Exhibit #12 - '375 Patent, #13 Exhibit #13 - '425 Patent, #14 Exhibit #14 - '415 Patent, #15 Exhibit #15 - '255 Patent, #16 Exhibit #16 - '795 Patent, #17 Exhibit #17 - '089 Patent, #18 Exhibit #18 - '022 Patent, #19 Exhibit #19 - '113 Patent, #20 Exhibit #20 - '239 Patent)(Fischer, Daniel) [Transferred from ned on 1/11/2019.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where XEROX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Anthony Baghdassarian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J Fischer