This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2020 at 09:10:00 (UTC).

Midwest Agronomy, LLC v. Ag-Co Chemical, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Midwest Agronomy, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ag-Co Chemical, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan M. Bazis and John M. Gerrard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03110

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan M. Bazis

Presiding Judge

John M. Gerrard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midwest Agronomy, LLC

Defendant

Ag-Co Chemical, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Victoria H. Buter

Attorney at KUTAK, ROCK LAW FIRM - OMAHA

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

Mattea Fosbender

Attorney at KUTAK, ROCK LAW FIRM - OMAHA

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

Defendant Attorneys

Michael T. Hilgers

Attorney at HILGERS, GRABEN LAW FIRM

575 Fallbrook Boulevard, Suite 202

Lincoln, NE 68521

Trenton D. Tanner

Attorney at HILGERS, GRABEN LAW FIRM

575 Fallbrook Boulevard, Suite 202

Lincoln, NE 68521

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to File Opposition to Ag-Co Chemical, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Agronomy, LLC.(Buter, Victoria) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

11 #1

Affidavit of Z. Shamburger

#11

(#11) INDEX in support of Brief #10 , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #9 by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Z. Shamburger)(Tanner, Trenton) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#10

(#10) BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #9 by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Agronomy, LLC.(Buter, Victoria) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#5

(#5) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-2875 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4238197) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Ag-Co Chemical, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Tanner, Trenton) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend. The plaintiff may respond to the defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #9 on or before December 4, 2020. The defendant may reply in support of its motion on or before December 11, 2020. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to File Opposition to Ag-Co Chemical, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Agronomy, LLC.(Buter, Victoria) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INDEX in support of Brief #10 , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #9 by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Z. Shamburger)(Tanner, Trenton) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #9 by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Plaintiff Midwest Agronomy, LLC.(Buter, Victoria) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 23, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Ag-Co Chemical, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LAC) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Midwest Agronomy, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LAC) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LAC) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-2875 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4238197) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Ag-Co Chemical, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Tanner, Trenton) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less