This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2019 at 07:36:17 (UTC).

Midsouth SB III, LLC v. Mall of Louisiana, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 Midsouth SB III, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mall of Louisiana, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00483

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIdsouth SB III, LLC

Defendants

Mall of Louisiana, LLC

General Growth Properties, Inc., AKA General Growth Services, Inc., AKA General Growth Management, Inc.

Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc.

General Growth Properties, Inc.

General Growth Services

General Growth Management

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ann R. Chandler

Attorney at Pittman Roberts Welsh, LLC

410 South President Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Defendant Attorney

David Matthew Kerth

Attorney at Jones Walker LLP

8555 United Plaza Boulevard, 5Th Floor

Baton Rouge, LA 70809-7000

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Notice to Counsel: In light of the attached letter to the court, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 11/14/2019 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/31/2019. (BLR) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

13 #2

Exhibit 1

13 #1

Memorandum in Support

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Mall of Louisiana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1)(Kerth, David) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

11 #1

Proposed Pleading; Order

#11

(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings by Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Mall of Louisiana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Kerth, David) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mall of Louisiana, LLC by Midsouth SB III, LLC. Mall of Louisiana, LLC served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Chandler, Ann) Modified on 8/15/2019 to edit the text (KMW). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to General Growth Properties, Inc., AKA General Growth Services, Inc., or General Growth Management, Inc. by Midsouth SB III, LLC. General Growth Properties, Inc. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Chandler, Ann) Modified on 8/15/2019 to edit the text (KMW). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc. by Midsouth SB III, LLC. Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Chandler, Ann) Modified on 8/15/2019 to edit the text (KMW). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/7/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Mall of Louisiana, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

5 #3

Attachment Summons General Growth Properties

5 #2

Attachment Summons Brookfield Properties Retail

5 #1

Attachment Summons for Mall of Louisiana

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Midsouth SB III, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons for Mall of Louisiana, #2 Attachment Summons Brookfield Properties Retail, #3 Attachment Summons General Growth Properties)(Chandler, Ann) (Attachments 1,2, and 3 replaced on 8/2/2019 to flatten the documents) (KMW). (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 8/1/2019, Midsouth SB III, LLC shall file a comprehensive Amended Complaint that adequately alleges the citizenship of Plaintiff and Mall of Louisiana, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/24/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Mall of Louisiana, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Collateral Proceeding by Midsouth SB III, LLC (Chandler, Ann) Modified on 7/24/2019 to edit plaintiff (SWE). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Notice to Counsel: In light of the attached letter to the court, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 11/14/2019 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/31/2019. (BLR) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Mall of Louisiana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1)(Kerth, David) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants are granted an extension to answer, otherwise plead or move, or file a responsive pleading in this matter until September 9, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings by Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Mall of Louisiana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Kerth, David) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mall of Louisiana, LLC by Midsouth SB III, LLC. Mall of Louisiana, LLC served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Chandler, Ann) Modified on 8/15/2019 to edit the text (KMW). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to General Growth Properties, Inc., AKA General Growth Services, Inc., or General Growth Management, Inc. by Midsouth SB III, LLC. General Growth Properties, Inc. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Chandler, Ann) Modified on 8/15/2019 to edit the text (KMW). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc. by Midsouth SB III, LLC. Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Chandler, Ann) Modified on 8/15/2019 to edit the text (KMW). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/7/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Mall of Louisiana, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Midsouth SB III, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons for Mall of Louisiana, #2 Attachment Summons Brookfield Properties Retail, #3 Attachment Summons General Growth Properties)(Chandler, Ann) (Attachments 1,2, and 3 replaced on 8/2/2019 to flatten the documents) (KMW). (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 8/1/2019, Midsouth SB III, LLC shall file a comprehensive Amended Complaint that adequately alleges the citizenship of Plaintiff and Mall of Louisiana, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/24/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Mall of Louisiana, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Collateral Proceeding by Midsouth SB III, LLC (Chandler, Ann) Modified on 7/24/2019 to edit plaintiff (SWE). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1975223.), filed by Midsouth SB III, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons -- Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc., #3 Attachment Summons -- General Growth Properties, Inc., #4 Attachment Summons -- Mall of Louisiana, LLC)(Chandler, Ann) Modified on 7/24/2019 to edit text(SWE). (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/24/2019 to flatten document and edit text) (SWE). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mall of Louisiana, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL GROWTH PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Brookfield Properties Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant