This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/25/2019 at 07:47:44 (UTC).

Midsouth Bank N A v. Quality Companies U S A L L C et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 Midsouth Bank N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Quality Companies U S A L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael J Juneau and Patrick J Hanna. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00091

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J Juneau

Referral Judge

Patrick J Hanna

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Midsouth Bank N A

Energy Services Note Acquisition L L C

Defendants

Nathan C Granger

Quality Companies USA, LLC

Kayro Investments, LLC

Troy D Collins

Quality Companies U S A L L C

Kayro Investments L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Billy J Domingue

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (LAF)

P O Box 52008 O C S

Lafayette, LA 70505

Joseph P Hebert

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (LAF)

P O Box 52008 O C S

Lafayette, LA 70505

Brian Wesley Capell

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (LAF)

P O Box 52008 O C S

Lafayette, LA 70505

Defendant Attorneys

William H L Kaufman

Attorney at Ottinger Hebert

P O Drawer 52606

Lafayette, LA 70505-2606

Benjamin David Jones

Attorney at Ottinger Hebert

P O Drawer 52606

Lafayette, LA 70505-2606

Michael C Wynne

Attorney at Ottinger Hebert

P O Drawer 52606

Lafayette, LA 70505-2606

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 15th Judicial District Court for Lafayette Parish. (crt,Guidry, C) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#13

(#13) JUDGMENT IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the plaintiffs motion for remand, Rec. Doc. #5 is GRANTED, consistent with the report and recommendation, and this matter is remanded to the 15th Judicial District Court, Lafayette Parish, Louisiana. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 2/25/2019. (crt,Guidry, C) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kayro Investments L L C, Quality Companies U S A L L C. (aty,Kaufman, William) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#10

(#10) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2) and Other Grounds filed by Energy Services Note Acquisition L L C. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, it is recommended that the motion be granted. Objections to R&R due by 2/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/8/2019. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Energy Services Note Acquisition L L C. (aty,Hebert, Joseph) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand & Consent to Remand filed by Troy D Collins, Nathan C Granger, Kayro Investments L L C, Quality Companies U S A L L C. (aty,Kaufman, William) Modified on 2/5/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion to Remand sent to Joseph P Hebert on behalf of Energy Services Note Acquisition L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/12/2019. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #5 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2) and Other Grounds. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion day set for 3/21/2019 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

5 #4

Exhibit C

5 #3

Exhibit B in globo

5 #2

Exhibit A

5 #1

Memo in Support

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2) and Other Grounds by Energy Services Note Acquisition L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B in globo, #4 Exhibit C)(Attorney Joseph P Hebert added to party Energy Services Note Acquisition, LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Hebert, Joseph) Modified on 1/29/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#4

(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/28/2019. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Reasor, M) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

1 #11

Exhibit G cont'd

1 #10

Exhibit G cont'd

1 #9

Exhibit G cont'd

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 15th Judicial District Court for Lafayette Parish. (crt,Guidry, C) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) JUDGMENT IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the plaintiffs motion for remand, Rec. Doc. #5 is GRANTED, consistent with the report and recommendation, and this matter is remanded to the 15th Judicial District Court, Lafayette Parish, Louisiana. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 2/25/2019. (crt,Guidry, C) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • (#12) ELECTRONIC ORDER. A report and recommendation having been issued, IT IS ORDERED that oral argument on the motion to remand (Rec. Doc. 5), which was previously scheduled for March 21, 2019, is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/19/2019. (crt,Nations, S) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kayro Investments L L C, Quality Companies U S A L L C. (aty,Kaufman, William) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2) and Other Grounds filed by Energy Services Note Acquisition L L C. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, it is recommended that the motion be granted. Objections to R&R due by 2/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/8/2019. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Energy Services Note Acquisition L L C. (aty,Hebert, Joseph) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand & Consent to Remand filed by Troy D Collins, Nathan C Granger, Kayro Investments L L C, Quality Companies U S A L L C. (aty,Kaufman, William) Modified on 2/5/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion to Remand sent to Joseph P Hebert on behalf of Energy Services Note Acquisition L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/12/2019. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #5 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2) and Other Grounds. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motion day set for 3/21/2019 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to indicate Midsouth Bank N A terminated pursuant to Order granting Motion to Substitute Party Energy Services Note Acquisition L L C for Midsouth Bank N A as indicated in Exhibit C of #5 Motion to Remand filed on 1/17/2019 in 15th JDC, Lafayette Parish, Louisiana, File No 20183035 B. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2) and Other Grounds by Energy Services Note Acquisition L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B in globo, #4 Exhibit C)(Attorney Joseph P Hebert added to party Energy Services Note Acquisition, LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Hebert, Joseph) Modified on 1/29/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/28/2019. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Reasor, M) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to William H L Kaufman on behalf of Kayro Investments L L C, Quality Companies U S A L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/8/2019. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Troy D Collins, Nathan C Granger, Kayro Investments L L C, Quality Companies U S A L L C filed on 12/17/2018 in Case No C-2018335 E, 15th JDC, Lafayette Parish, Louisiana. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading filed within pdf of attachment to #1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number C-20183035 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3858836) filed by Kayro Investments L L C, Nathan C Granger, Quality Companies U S A L L C, Troy D Collins. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit & Certificate, #2 Civil cover sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B - F, #5 State court petition Exhibit G, #6 State court petition Exhibit G cont'd, #7 Exhibit G cont'd, #8 Exhibit G cont'd, #9 Exhibit G cont'd, #10 Exhibit G cont'd, #11 Exhibit G cont'd)(Attorney William H L Kaufman added to party Troy D Collins(pty:dft), Nathan C Granger(pty:dft), Kayro Investments L L C(pty:dft), Quality Companies U S A L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Kaufman, William) Modified on 1/25/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quality is a litigant

Latest cases where MidSouth Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael C Wynne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin David Jones