This case was last updated from PACER on 11/14/2021 at 09:03:56 (UTC).

Midland National Life Insurance Company v. Viering et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Midland National Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Viering. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Jarrod Hazel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02356

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Jarrod Hazel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland National Life Insurance Company

Defendants

Nicolette Viering

Victoria Jenkins

Lovely Jenkins

Unknown Personal Representative of THE ESTATE of NORMA P. JENKINS

Raymond Funeral Service, P.A.

American Capital Funding, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Michael Trager

Attorney at Funk & Bolton, P.A.

100 Light Street, Suite 1400

Baltimore, MD 21202

Defendant Attorney

Eden Joanna Brown Gaines

Attorney at Brown Gaines LLC

Suite 200, 800 Maine Avenue Sw

Washington, DC 20024

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Nicolette Viering Line of Dismissal (Brown Gaines, Eden) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Paperless ORDER approving #2 Notice of Dismissal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/24/2021. (jw2s, Chambers) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Nicolette Viering Line of Dismissal (Brown Gaines, Eden) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charles County Circuit Court, case number C-08-CV-21-000220. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9495125), filed by Victoria Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Brown Gaines, Eden) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN CAPITAL ENT is a litigant

Latest cases where MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant