This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2021 at 09:33:05 (UTC).

Midland National Life Insurance Company v. Truong

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 Midland National Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Truong. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine D Little and John E Dowdell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00116

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christine D Little

Presiding Judge

John E Dowdell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland National Life Insurance Company

Defendant

Hong Truong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Leasa M Stewart

Attorney at Gable Gotwals (OKC)

211 N Robinson Ste 1500

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7101

Sara G Janes

Attorney at Chittenden, Murday & Novotny LLC

303 West Madison Street, Suite 2400

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Hong Truong (Re: #6 Amended Complaint ) by Midland National Life Insurance Company (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Hong Truong (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sara G Janes on behalf of Midland National Life Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Sara G Janes added to party Midland National Life Insurance Company(pty:pla).] (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#6

(#6) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hong Truong (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midland National Life Insurance Company (Stewart, Leasa) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Sammons Financial Group, Inc. for Midland National Life Insurance Company) by Midland National Life Insurance Company (Stewart, Leasa) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leasa M Stewart on behalf of Midland National Life Insurance Company (Stewart, Leasa) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Hong Truong (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2375342) by Midland National Life Insurance Company (Stewart, Leasa) Modified on 3/17/2021 to add receipt information (ll, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Midland National Life Insurance Company (Stewart, Leasa) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Hong Truong (Re: #6 Amended Complaint ) by Midland National Life Insurance Company (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Hong Truong (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sara G Janes on behalf of Midland National Life Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Sara G Janes added to party Midland National Life Insurance Company(pty:pla).] (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hong Truong (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Midland National Life Insurance Company (Stewart, Leasa) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Midland National Life Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Sammons Financial Group, Inc. for Midland National Life Insurance Company) by Midland National Life Insurance Company (Stewart, Leasa) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leasa M Stewart on behalf of Midland National Life Insurance Company (Stewart, Leasa) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Hong Truong (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2375342) by Midland National Life Insurance Company (Stewart, Leasa) Modified on 3/17/2021 to add receipt information (ll, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Midland National Life Insurance Company (Stewart, Leasa) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara G. Janes