This case was last updated from PACER on 05/29/2021 at 11:59:31 (UTC).

Midland National Life Insurance Company v. Hogan et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Midland National Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hogan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Roberto A. Lange. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-03006

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roberto A. Lange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland National Life Insurance Company

Defendants

Marilyn R. Hogan

Connie Lou Watts Hogan

Elizabeth Ann Hogan

Holmes Funeral Home, Inc.

Debra Lynn Hogan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael L. Snyder

Attorney at Davenport, Evans, Hurwitz & Smith, LLP

206 West 14Th Street, Po Box 1030

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-1030

Craig M. Bargher

Attorney at Chittenden, Murday & Novotny, LLC

303 West Madison Street, Suite 2400

Chicago, IL 60606

David J. Novotny

Attorney at Chittenden, Murday & Novotny, LLC

303 West Madison Street, Suite 2400

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Clint L. Sargent

Attorney at Meierhenry Sargent LLP

315 South Phillips Avenue

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

Stephanie E. Pochop

Attorney at Johnson Pochop & Bartling Law Office

405 Main Street

Gregory, SD 57533

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

19 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - proposed Order

#19

(#19) MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - proposed Order) (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Debra Lynn Hogan. (Pochop, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#4

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Craig M. Bargher for Midland National Life Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 04/07/2021. (LH) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Midland National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Sammons Financial Group, Inc. for Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

2 #6

AO85 form

2 #5

Summons Issued - Holmes Funeral Home, Inc.

2 #4

Summons Issued -Marilyn Hogan

2 #3

Summons Issued -Elizabeth Hogan

2 #2

Summons Issued - Connie Watts Hogan

2 #1

Summons Issued - Debra Hogan

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 5 Summonses, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Debra Hogan, #2 Summons Issued - Connie Watts Hogan, #3 Summons Issued -Elizabeth Hogan, #4 Summons Issued -Marilyn Hogan, #5 Summons Issued - Holmes Funeral Home, Inc., #6 AO85 form)(JLS) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

1 #8

Ex 8 - Assignment of Insurance Proceeds

1 #7

Ex 7 - Certificate of Marriage

1 #2

Ex 2 - Decree of Divorce

1 #1

Ex 1 - Life Insurance Policy

#1

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Elizabeth Ann Hogan, Marilyn R. Hogan, Holmes Funeral Home, Inc., Connie Lou Watts Hogan. (Sargent, Clint) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - proposed Order) (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Debra Lynn Hogan. (Pochop, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 04/19/2021. (LH) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Elizabeth Ann Hogan, Marilyn R. Hogan, Holmes Funeral Home, Inc., Connie Lou Watts Hogan. (Sargent, Clint) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Midland National Life Insurance Company. Holmes Funeral Home, Inc. waiver sent on 4/13/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Midland National Life Insurance Company. Marilyn R. Hogan waiver sent on 4/9/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Midland National Life Insurance Company. Elizabeth Ann Hogan waiver sent on 4/9/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Midland National Life Insurance Company. Connie Lou Watts Hogan waiver sent on 4/9/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Holmes Funeral Home, Inc.. (Sargent, Clint) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Clint L. Sargent on behalf of Elizabeth Ann Hogan, Marilyn R. Hogan, Holmes Funeral Home, Inc., Connie Lou Watts Hogan. (Sargent, Clint) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie E. Pochop on behalf of Debra Lynn Hogan. (Pochop, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debra Lynn Hogan. Debra Lynn Hogan waiver sent on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Pochop, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David J. Novotny for Midland National Life Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 04/07/2021. (LH) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Craig M. Bargher for Midland National Life Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 04/07/2021. (LH) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Attorney David J. Novotny to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3513726) by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Attorney Craig M. Bargher to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3513717) by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Midland National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Sammons Financial Group, Inc. for Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 5 Summonses, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Debra Hogan, #2 Summons Issued - Connie Watts Hogan, #3 Summons Issued -Elizabeth Hogan, #4 Summons Issued -Marilyn Hogan, #5 Summons Issued - Holmes Funeral Home, Inc., #6 AO85 form)(JLS) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER, $402 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3510356, in shell case on 3/30/2021 filed by Midland National Life Insurance Company on 3/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Life Insurance Policy, #2 Ex 2 - Decree of Divorce, #3 x 3 - Beneficiary Change Request, #4 Ex 4 - Midland National letter to Brian Hogan 2-08-2018, #5 Ex 5 - Beneficiary Change Request 2-23-2018, #6 Ex 6 - 3-06-2018 Endorsement, #7 Ex 7 - Certificate of Marriage, #8 Ex 8 - Assignment of Insurance Proceeds) (JLS) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David J. Novotny

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig M. Bargher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael L Snyder