This case was last updated from PACER on 05/09/2021 at 08:52:02 (UTC).

Midland National Life Insurance Company v. Gordon et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Midland National Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Gordon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00405

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland National Life Insurance Company

Defendants

Stacy Gordon

Aaron Gordon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Robert Jeffery

Attorney at Chittenden Murday & Novotny LLC

303 W Madison St., Ste. 1400

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorney

Michael J Hoover

Attorney at Interpleader Law LLC

9015 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER This matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 45 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. All pending hearings and deadlines are vacated. All pending motions are found to be moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate this matter on June 18, 2021 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/04/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Settlement by Aaron Gordon. (Hoover, Michael) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER - Midland deposit into the Court's registry the sum of at least $205,451.47 representing the death benefits owed under life insurance policy no. 1501421065. The Clerk shall accept Midland's deposit into the Court's registry to be handled as directed pending further order by this Court. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/29/21. (DXD) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE re: Service by Midland National Life Insurance Company re: #7 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Jeffery, Joseph) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on June 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/11/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/11/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/11/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jeffery, Joseph) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#4

(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19239667. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00405-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Jeffery, Joseph) (REM) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19239667 filed by Midland National Life Insurance Company.(Jeffery, Joseph) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER This matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 45 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. All pending hearings and deadlines are vacated. All pending motions are found to be moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate this matter on June 18, 2021 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/04/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Settlement by Aaron Gordon. (Hoover, Michael) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER - Midland deposit into the Court's registry the sum of at least $205,451.47 representing the death benefits owed under life insurance policy no. 1501421065. The Clerk shall accept Midland's deposit into the Court's registry to be handled as directed pending further order by this Court. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/29/21. (DXD) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael J Hoover on behalf of Defendant Aaron Gordon. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE re: Service by Midland National Life Insurance Company re: #7 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Jeffery, Joseph) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on June 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/11/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/11/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/11/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jeffery, Joseph) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joseph Robert Jeffery on behalf of Plaintiff Midland National Life Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19239667. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00405-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Jeffery, Joseph) (REM) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Complaint Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REM) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19239667 filed by Midland National Life Insurance Company.(Jeffery, Joseph) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Hoover