This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2021 at 07:22:15 (UTC).

Midland National Life Insurance Company v. Finlan et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Midland National Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Finlan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01471

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland National Life Insurance Company

Cross Claimants and Defendants

Laura L. Finlan

Allan R. Karpauitz

Taylor R. Pruyne

Jacob R. Finlan, II

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Allan R. Karpauitz

Taylor R. Pruyne

Jacob R. Finlan, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark R. Kehoe

Attorney at McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP

Suite 1500, 1617 Jfk Blvd.

Philadelphia, PA 19103-1815

David J. Novotny

Attorney at Chittenden, Murday & Novotny LLC

303 West Madison Street, Ste 2400

Chicago, IL 60606

Ridhi D. Madia

Attorney at Chittenden, Murday & Novotny LLC

303 W. Madison Street, Suite 2400

Chicago, IL 60606

Cross Claimant and Defendant Attorney

Darren A. Mendrzycki

Attorney at Griffin, Dawsey, DePaola & Jones, P.C.

101 Main Street

Towanda, PA 18848

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Certificate of Service

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Summons Packet

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Policy

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Midland National Life Insurance Company. Taylor R. Pruyne waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Kehoe, Mark) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Midland National Life Insurance Company. Jacob R. Finlan, II waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Kehoe, Mark) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Midland National Life Insurance Company. Allan R. Karpauitz waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Kehoe, Mark) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Midland National Life Insurance Company. Laura L. Finlan waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Kehoe, Mark) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 9/14/2021. (jr) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Jacob R. Finlan, II, Allan R. Karpauitz, Taylor R. Pruyne by Laura L. Finlan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mendrzycki, Darren) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Ridhi Madia. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 8/27/2021. (lg) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Ridhi D. Madia on behalf of Midland National Life Insurance Company Attorney Ridhi Madia is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5680043.. (Madia, Ridhi) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney David Novotny. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 8/27/2021. (lg) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by David J. Novotny on behalf of Midland National Life Insurance Company Attorney David Novotny is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5679698.. (Novotny, David) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Kehoe, Mark) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Jacob R. Finlan, II, Laura L. Finlan, Allan R. Karpauitz, Taylor R. Pruyne and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER against Jacob R. Finlan, II, Laura L. Finlan, Allan R. Karpauitz, Taylor R. Pruyne ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5678038), filed by Midland National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDLAND NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant