This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2021 at 10:00:28 (UTC).

Middletown Township v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Middletown Township filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45030

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDDLETOWN TOWNSHIP

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Rite Aid Corporation

HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co

Walgreen Co

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Wal-Mart Inc.

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Value Drug Company

KVK-Tech Inc

ORTHO-McNEILJANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC

Cephalon Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Walgreen Eastern Co.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARRY SCATTON

Attorney at Marc J. Bern & Partners

101 West Elm Street Suite 215

Conshohocken, PA 19428

Barry J. Scatton

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan

2005 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Frank F. Voler

Attorney at Marc J. Bern & Partners

101 West Elm Street

Conshohocken, PA 17569

Defendant Attorney

Thomas E. Rice, Jr.

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice - Kansas City

2400 E. Pershing Road

Kansas City, MO 64108

Other Attorneys

Mark D. Villanueva

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young

2005 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#2

#5

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-186) filed by MIDDLETOWN TOWNSHIP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Voler, Frank) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Attorney Appearance by Frank F. Voler filed on behalf of Plaintiff. (P,R) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK-Tech Inc. (Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK-Tech Inc. (Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Eastern. Case number 2:21-cv-00629. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER THAT CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-186) PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1 OF THE RULES OF PROCEDURE OF THE UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, THE ACTION(S) ON THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE ARE TRANSFERRED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1407 TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ORDER OF DECEMBER 5, 2017, AND, WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DAN A. POLSTER. (jaa, ) [Transferred from paed on 2/23/2021.] (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docket(#4) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of DELAWARE County. (sg, ) [Transferred from paed on 2/23/2021.] (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION of State Court Order Staying Defendants Response Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/23/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION.(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/23/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14907933), filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (transfer order), #2 Exhibit 2 (pleadings), #3 Exhibit 3 (consent), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form, #6 Case Management Track Form)(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/23/2021.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDDLETOWN TOWNSHIP N.J. is a litigant

Latest cases where Value Drug Company is a litigant

Latest cases where KVK-Tech, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where H D SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY is a litigant