This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2021 at 07:10:53 (UTC).

MIDDLETOWN TOWNSHIP v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 MIDDLETOWN TOWNSHIP filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAN R. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00629

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDDLETOWN TOWNSHIP

Defendants

MCKESSON CORPORATION

ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. F/K/A WATSON PHARMA, INC.

ANDA, INC.

RITE AID CORPORATION

HD SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY

WAL-MART INC.

WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. N/K/A ACTAVIS, INC.

AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC

ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

VALUE DRUG COMPANY

CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.

ORTHO-McNEILJANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

ECKERD CORPORATION

ALLERGAN PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS PLC

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC. N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.

CEPHALON, INC.

ACTAVIS, LLC

RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC. DBA RITE AID MID-ATLANTIC CUSTOMER SUPPORT CENTER, INC.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY SCATTON

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, P.A.

1800 John F. Kennedy Blvd, Suite 1401

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Other Attorneys

MARK D. VILLANUEVA

Attorney at STRADLEY RONON STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP

2005 Market Street, Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1 (transfer order)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 (pleadings)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 (consent)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Designation Form

1 #6

Case Management Track Form

#2

#3

3 #1

Exhibit A

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal STATE COURT record together with certified copy of DOCKET AND ORDER FORWARD TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO. (JL ) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal record transferred to the Northern District of Ohio via interdistrict transfer system. Original Court of Common Pleas record will be sent via certified mail.(lisad, ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER THAT CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-186) PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1 OF THE RULES OF PROCEDURE OF THE UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, THE ACTION(S) ON THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE ARE TRANSFERRED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1407 TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ORDER OF DECEMBER 5, 2017, AND, WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DAN A. POLSTER. (jaa, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docket(#4) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of DELAWARE County. (sg, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION of State Court Order Staying Defendants Response Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(VILLANUEVA, MARK) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION.(VILLANUEVA, MARK) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14907933), filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (transfer order), #2 Exhibit 2 (pleadings), #3 Exhibit 3 (consent), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form, #6 Case Management Track Form)(VILLANUEVA, MARK) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDDLETOWN TOWNSHIP N.J. is a litigant

Latest cases where Value Drug Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Eckerd Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where H D SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY is a litigant