This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2020 at 09:42:52 (UTC).

Middleton v. Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 Middleton filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas R. Cole. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00668

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas R. Cole

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sharon Middleton

Charles Clendenin

Defendants

Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company

LM General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin C. Hulick

Attorney at Spangenberg Shibley & Liber LLP

1001 Lakeside Avenue East, Suite 1700

Cleveland, OH 44114

Stuart E Scott

Attorney at Spangenberg Shibley & Liber LLP

1001 Lakeside Avenue East, Suite 1700

Cleveland, OH 44114-3400

Andrew Shamis

Attorney at Shamis & Gentile, P.A.

14 Ne 1St Avenue, Ste 1205

Miami, FL 33132

Andrew J. Shamis

Attorney at Shamis & Gentile, P.A.

14 Ne 1St Avenue, Ste 1205

Miami, FL 33132

Defendant Attorney

William M Harter

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC

10 West Broad Street, Suite 2300

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #5

Exhibit E - Clendenin Settlement Breakdown (Redacted)

12 #4

Exhibit D - Clendenin Market Valuation Report (Redacted

12 #3

Exhibit C - Middleton Settlement (Redacted)

12 #2

Exhibit B - Middleton Valuation (Redacted)

12 #1

Exhibit A - Middleton Policy (Redacted)

#12

11 #1

Exhibit 1 - 1st Amended Class Action Complaint with Exs. A-E

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #1

Certified Mail Receipt Return

#6

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

4 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Andrew J. Shamis

#4

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: LM General Insurance Company answer due 10/30/2020; Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company answer due 10/30/2020. (sct) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION Stipulated Extension of Time to Move or Plead to Amended Complaint by Defendants LM General Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company. (Harter, William) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) - Class Action against All Defendants, filed by Sharon Middleton, Charles Clendenin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Middleton Policy (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B - Middleton Valuation (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C - Middleton Settlement (Redacted), #4 Exhibit D - Clendenin Market Valuation Report (Redacted, #5 Exhibit E - Clendenin Settlement Breakdown (Redacted)) (Scott, Stuart) Modified docket text on 10/13/2020 (kh). (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint. Plaintiff shall file their proposed amended class action complaint in the CM/ECF system. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 10/9/20. (sct) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint by Plaintiff Sharon Middleton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1st Amended Class Action Complaint with Exs. A-E) (Scott, Stuart) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed (Not Effectuated related to COVID19) as to Defendant Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company. Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (kl) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines re #9 : Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company answer due 10/9/2020. (kl) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Stipulated Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company. (Harter, William) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company. Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Shamis, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Shamis for Plaintiff Sharon Middleton (Shamis, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (kh) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. Shamis as CO-COUNSEL is this matter only. In the event Pro Hac Vice counsel has not yet received a login and password from the Clerk of Courts, they should promptly comply with the Courts Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures Manual which can be found at the Courts website, www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 8/28/20. (eh) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company. (eh) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7627882) of Andrew J. Shamis by Plaintiff Sharon Middleton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Andrew J. Shamis, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Hulick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Hulick for Plaintiff Sharon Middleton (Hulick, Kevin) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart E Scott for Plaintiff Sharon Middleton (Scott, Stuart) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 paid), filed by Sharon Middleton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Policy, #2 Exhibit B- Market Valuation, #3 Exhibit C- Settlement Breakdown, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Form) (Shamis, Andrew) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where LM General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin C. Hulick

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew John Shamis