This case was last updated from PACER on 02/12/2021 at 12:02:02 (UTC).

Middlesex Insurance Company v. West Brothers Construction Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 Middlesex Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against West Brothers Construction Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy Percy and Sharion Aycock. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00248

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy Percy

Presiding Judge

Sharion Aycock

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Middlesex Insurance Company

Defendants

West Brothers Construction Inc.

Lowndes County School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Norman M. Stockman

Attorney at HAND ARENDALL HARRISON SALE LLC

P. O. Box 123, 104 Francis Street, Suite 300

Mobile, AL 36601

Defendant Attorneys

Jacob A. Bradley

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES PLLC

P.O. Box 119, 190 East Capitol Street, Suite 100

Jackson, MS 39201

Cody C. Bailey

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES

P. O. Drawer 119, 190 E. Capital Street, Suite #100

Jackson, MS 39201

Joseph Walter Gill

Attorney at CURRIE, JOHNSON, GRIFFIN, GAINES & MYERS

1044 River Oaks Drive

Jackson, MS 39205-0750

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 3/15/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer West Brothers Construction Inc. answer due 2/24/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/8/21. (bnd)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed by West Brothers Construction Inc.. (Bradley, Jacob)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cody C. Bailey on behalf of West Brothers Construction Inc. (Bailey, Cody)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob A. Bradley on behalf of West Brothers Construction Inc. (Bradley, Jacob)

#9

(#9) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/3/2021. (rtc)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Lowndes County School District answer due 2/23/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/2/21. (bnd)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Lowndes County School District. (Gill, Joseph)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Walter Gill on behalf of Lowndes County School District (Gill, Joseph)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman M. Stockman on behalf of Middlesex Insurance Company West Brothers Construction Inc. served on 1/20/2021. (Stockman, Norman)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman M. Stockman on behalf of Middlesex Insurance Company Lowndes County School District served on 1/19/2021. (Stockman, Norman)

#3

(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to West Brothers Construction Inc., and Lowndes County School District (jla)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Returned to attorney by email for service. (jwr)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B-Insurance Policy

1 #1

Exhibit A-Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0537-1885409, filed by Middlesex Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Insurance Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 3/15/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer West Brothers Construction Inc. answer due 2/24/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/8/21. (bnd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed by West Brothers Construction Inc.. (Bradley, Jacob)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cody C. Bailey on behalf of West Brothers Construction Inc. (Bailey, Cody)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob A. Bradley on behalf of West Brothers Construction Inc. (Bradley, Jacob)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/3/2021. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Lowndes County School District answer due 2/23/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/2/21. (bnd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Lowndes County School District. (Gill, Joseph)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Walter Gill on behalf of Lowndes County School District (Gill, Joseph)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman M. Stockman on behalf of Middlesex Insurance Company West Brothers Construction Inc. served on 1/20/2021. (Stockman, Norman)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman M. Stockman on behalf of Middlesex Insurance Company Lowndes County School District served on 1/19/2021. (Stockman, Norman)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to West Brothers Construction Inc., and Lowndes County School District (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Returned to attorney by email for service. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0537-1885409, filed by Middlesex Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Insurance Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lowndes County School District is a litigant

Latest cases where MIDDLESEX INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Norman Matt Stockman