This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2021 at 08:31:26 (UTC).

Middlesex Insurance Company et al v. Cross Creek Multifamily, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Middlesex Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cross Creek Multifamily, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Keith Starrett and Michael T. Parker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00124

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith Starrett

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Middlesex Insurance Company

Sentry Insurance

Defendants

Cross Creek Multifamily, LLC

Perren Masonry, LLC

ICI Construction, Inc.

Doe's A-D

Doe's E-H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William E. Whitfield, III

Attorney at COPELAND, COOK, TAYLOR & BUSH, PA - Gulfport

P. O. Box 10

Gulfport, MS 39502-0010

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A-Complaint - Underlying Lawsuit

1 #3

Exhibit B-ICI Thrid Party Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit C-1-Sentry Policy - 2014-2015

1 #5

Exhibit C-2-Sentry Policy 2015-2016

1 #6

Exhibit C-3-Sentry Policy - 2016-2017

1 #7

Exhibit C-4-Sentry Policy - 2017-2018

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Middlesex Insurance Company. Cross Creek Multifamily, LLC waiver sent on 9/25/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Whitfield, William) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#3

(#3) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Middlesex Insurance Company, Sentry Insurance (Welch, James) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Middlesex Insurance Company, Sentry Insurance (Welch, James) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Middlesex Insurance Company. Cross Creek Multifamily, LLC waiver sent on 9/25/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Whitfield, William) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cross Creek Multifamily, LLC, Doe's A-D, Doe's E-H, ICI Construction, Inc., Perren Masonry, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMSSDC-4664564), filed by Middlesex Insurance Company, Sentry Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint - Underlying Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit B-ICI Thrid Party Complaint, #4 Exhibit C-1-Sentry Policy - 2014-2015, #5 Exhibit C-2-Sentry Policy 2015-2016, #6 Exhibit C-3-Sentry Policy - 2016-2017, #7 Exhibit C-4-Sentry Policy - 2017-2018) (CS) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ICI Construction, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MIDDLESEX INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where Sentry Insurance A Mutual Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William E. Whitfield, III