This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2019 at 08:09:52 (UTC).

Microport Orthopedics, Inc. v. Synergy Surgical Products, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Microport Orthopedics, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Synergy Surgical Products, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Thomas L. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02676

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Microport Orthopedics, Inc.

Defendant

Synergy Surgical Products, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa A. Krupicka

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Gary Scott Peeples

Attorney at Burch, Porter & Johnson, PLLC

130 North Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microport Orthopedics, Inc. as to Synergy Surgical Products, LLC. (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Microport Orthopedics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MicroPort Orthopedics Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent MicroPort Scientific Cooperatief U.A., Corporate Parent MicroPort Orthopedics Corp., Corporate Parent MicroPort Surgical Corp., Corporate Parent Shanghai MicroPort Orthopedics Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent MicroPort Orthopedics (Suzhou) Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent MicroPort Scientific Corporation for Microport Orthopedics, Inc... (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Synergy Surgical Products, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Scott Peeples on behalf of Microport Orthopedics, Inc. (Peeples, Gary) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit A - Distributor Agreement

1 #2

Summons - Synergy Surgical Products, LLC Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Synergy Surgical Products, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3183876), filed by Microport Orthopedics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Synergy Surgical Products, LLC Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Distributor Agreement)(Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microport Orthopedics, Inc. as to Synergy Surgical Products, LLC. (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Microport Orthopedics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MicroPort Orthopedics Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent MicroPort Scientific Cooperatief U.A., Corporate Parent MicroPort Orthopedics Corp., Corporate Parent MicroPort Surgical Corp., Corporate Parent Shanghai MicroPort Orthopedics Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent MicroPort Orthopedics (Suzhou) Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent MicroPort Scientific Corporation for Microport Orthopedics, Inc... (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Synergy Surgical Products, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Scott Peeples on behalf of Microport Orthopedics, Inc. (Peeples, Gary) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Synergy Surgical Products, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3183876), filed by Microport Orthopedics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Synergy Surgical Products, LLC Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Distributor Agreement)(Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Microport Orthopedics Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa A. Krupicka

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Scott Peeples