This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/02/2019 at 08:24:46 (UTC).

Microport Orthopedics, Inc. v. Outcome Medical, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 Microport Orthopedics, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Outcome Medical, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane K. Vescovo and Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02675

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Microport Orthopedics, Inc.

Defendants

Outcome Medical, LLC

R & B Medical Services and Supplies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa A. Krupicka

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Gary Scott Peeples

Attorney at Burch, Porter & Johnson, PLLC

130 North Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

Milton Dale Conder, Jr.

Attorney at RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL

209 E. Main St., P.O. Box 1147

Jackson, TN 38302-1147

Marty R. Phillips

Attorney at RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL

105 S. Highland Ave., P.O. Box 1147

Jackson, TN 38302-1147

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Monday, 12/16/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Please follow the instructions on the Notice of Setting to gain access to the telephonic conference. (jrs) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Milton Dale Conder, Jr on behalf of Outcome Medical, LLC, R & B Medical Services and Supplies, Inc. (Conder, Milton) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Outcome Medical, LLC, R & B Medical Services and Supplies, Inc..(Phillips, Marty) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Marty R. Phillips on behalf of Outcome Medical, LLC, R & B Medical Services and Supplies, Inc. (Phillips, Marty) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microport Orthopedics, Inc. as to R & B Medical Services and Supplies, Inc.. (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microport Orthopedics, Inc. as to Outcome Medical, LLC. (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Microport Orthopedics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MicroPort Orthopedics Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent MicroPort Scientific Cooperatief U.A., Corporate Parent MicroPort Orthopedics Corp., Corporate Parent MicroPort Surgical Corp., Corporate Parent Shanghai MicroPort Orthopedics Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent MicroPort Orthopedics (Suzhou) Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent MicroPort Scientific Corporation for Microport Orthopedics, Inc... (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to R & B Medical Services and Supplies, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Outcome Medical, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#3

(#3) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Scott Peeples on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Peeples, Gary) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit B to Complaint - Notice of Assignment

1 #4

Exhibit A to Complaint - Distributor Agreement

1 #3

Summons - R & B Medical Services and Supplies, Inc. Summons

1 #2

Summons - Outcome Medical, LLC Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3183071), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Outcome Medical, LLC Summons, #3 Summons - R & B Medical Services and Supplies, Inc. Summons, #4 Exhibit A to Complaint - Distributor Agreement, #5 Exhibit B to Complaint - Notice of Assignment, #6 Exhibit C to Complaint - Sales Employee Agreement)(Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Monday, 12/16/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Please follow the instructions on the Notice of Setting to gain access to the telephonic conference. (jrs) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Milton Dale Conder, Jr on behalf of Outcome Medical, LLC, R & B Medical Services and Supplies, Inc. (Conder, Milton) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Outcome Medical, LLC, R & B Medical Services and Supplies, Inc..(Phillips, Marty) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Marty R. Phillips on behalf of Outcome Medical, LLC, R & B Medical Services and Supplies, Inc. (Phillips, Marty) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microport Orthopedics, Inc. as to R & B Medical Services and Supplies, Inc.. (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microport Orthopedics, Inc. as to Outcome Medical, LLC. (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Microport Orthopedics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MicroPort Orthopedics Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent MicroPort Scientific Cooperatief U.A., Corporate Parent MicroPort Orthopedics Corp., Corporate Parent MicroPort Surgical Corp., Corporate Parent Shanghai MicroPort Orthopedics Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent MicroPort Orthopedics (Suzhou) Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent MicroPort Scientific Corporation for Microport Orthopedics, Inc... (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to R & B Medical Services and Supplies, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Outcome Medical, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Scott Peeples on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Peeples, Gary) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3183071), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Outcome Medical, LLC Summons, #3 Summons - R & B Medical Services and Supplies, Inc. Summons, #4 Exhibit A to Complaint - Distributor Agreement, #5 Exhibit B to Complaint - Notice of Assignment, #6 Exhibit C to Complaint - Sales Employee Agreement)(Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Microport Orthopedics Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa A. Krupicka