This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2021 at 07:44:42 (UTC).

MicroPairing Technologies LLC v. Volvo Car USA LLC

Case Summary

On October 25, 2021, MicroPairing Technologies, LLC (“MicroPairing” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Brian P. Herrmann, Charles Austin Ginnings, Edward Nelson, III, Ryan Griffin, and Timothy E. Grochocinski of Nelson Bumgardner Conroy P.C., filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Volvo Car USA, LLC (“Volvo” or “Defendant”), seeking damages and reasonable royalties along with pre- and post-judgment interest among other relief for the alleged infringement of United States patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 6,778,073 (the ’073 patent), 7,793,136 (the ’136 patent), 7,178,049 (the ’049 patent), 8,020,028 (the ’028 patent), and 8,006,117 (the ’117 patent) (collectively, the “patents-in-suit”) owned by the Plaintiff.

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that “Volvo has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’073 patent in this District and elsewhere in Texas and the United States. Volvo has infringed and continues to infringe, either by itself or via an agent, at least claim 10 of the ’073 patent by, among other things, making, having made, offering to sell, selling, testing, and/or using Volvo vehicles equipped with infotainment systems. MicroPairing has been damaged as a result of Volvo’s infringing conduct.”

Plaintiff further alleged that “Volvo has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’136 patent in this District and elsewhere in Texas and the United States. Volvo has infringed and continues to infringe, either by itself or via an agent, at least claims 1 and 31 of the ’136 patent by, among other things, making, offering to sell, selling, testing, and/or using Volvo vehicles equipped with infotainment systems. In addition and/or in the alternative to its direct infringement, Volvo has indirectly infringed and continues to indirectly infringe one or more claims of the ’136 patent by inducing direct infringement by its Volvo vehicle customers and end-users.”

Plaintiff also alleged that “Volvo has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’049 patent in this District and elsewhere in Texas and the United States. In addition or in the alternative, Volvo has infringed and continues to infringe, either by itself or via an agent, at least claim 29 of the ’049 patent by, among other things, testing and using Volvo vehicles that operate on the AUTOSAR platform.”

Similar claims have been made by Plaintiff with reference to the alleged infringement of other patents-in-suit.

There are five claims for relief laid down by Plaintiff, one for the alleged infringement of each of the patents-in-suit.

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court for an order that Volvo has directly infringed one or more claims of each of the patents-in-suit, an order that Volvo has induced infringement of one or more claims of the ’136 patent, ’049 patent, and ’028 patent, an order that Volvo must pay MicroPairing reasonable ongoing royalties on a go-forward basis after final judgment, an order that Volvo must pay MicroPairing pre- and post-judgment interest on the damages award, and an order that Volvo must pay MicroPairing’s costs along with such other and further relief as the Court may deem just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01108

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MicroPairing Technologies LLC

Defendant

Volvo Car USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian P. Herrmann

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy P.C.

3131 West 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Charles Austin Ginnings

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC

15020 S. Ravinia Ave., Suite 29

Orland Park, IL 60462

Ryan Griffin

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC

2727 N. Harwood Street, Suite 250

Dallas, TX 75201

Timothy E. Grochocinski

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC

15020 S. Ravinia Ave., Suite 29

Orland Park, IL 60462

Edward Nelson, III

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy P.C.

3131 West 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Defendant Attorneys

John Allen Yates

Attorney at Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

24 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77046

Joshua Hain Park

Attorney at Patterson & Sheridan LLP

24 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77046

Kyrie Kimber Cameron

Attorney at Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

24 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77046-2472

Barden Todd Patterson

Attorney at Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

24 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77046-2472

Craig V. Depew

Attorney at Patterson Sheridan LLP

900 Washington Ave., Suite 503

Waco, TX 76701

Edgar Neil Gonzalez

Attorney at Patterson Sheridan LLP

24 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77046

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE Unopposed Notice Extending Time to File Case Readiness Status Report by MicroPairing Technologies LLC (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig V. Depew on behalf of Volvo Car USA LLC. Attorney Craig V. Depew added to party Volvo Car USA LLC(pty:dft) (Depew, Craig) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Hain Park on behalf of Volvo Car USA LLC (Park, Joshua) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edgar Neil Gonzalez on behalf of Volvo Car USA LLC (Gonzalez, Edgar) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyrie Kimber Cameron on behalf of Volvo Car USA LLC (Cameron, Kyrie) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Allen Yates on behalf of Volvo Car USA LLC (Yates, John) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barden Todd Patterson on behalf of Volvo Car USA LLC (Patterson, Barden) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#9

(#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Volvo Car USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Volvo Car Corporation, Corporate Parent Volvo Cars of North America, LLC, Corporate Parent Zhejiang Geely Holding Group Co., Ltd. for Volvo Car USA LLC. (Patterson, Barden) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Volvo Car USA LLC.(Patterson, Barden) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

1 #10

Exhibit 9

1 #9

Exhibit 8

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

#1

17 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE Unopposed Notice Extending Time to File Case Readiness Status Report by MicroPairing Technologies LLC (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig V. Depew on behalf of Volvo Car USA LLC. Attorney Craig V. Depew added to party Volvo Car USA LLC(pty:dft) (Depew, Craig) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Hain Park on behalf of Volvo Car USA LLC (Park, Joshua) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edgar Neil Gonzalez on behalf of Volvo Car USA LLC (Gonzalez, Edgar) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyrie Kimber Cameron on behalf of Volvo Car USA LLC (Cameron, Kyrie) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Allen Yates on behalf of Volvo Car USA LLC (Yates, John) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barden Todd Patterson on behalf of Volvo Car USA LLC (Patterson, Barden) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Volvo Car USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Volvo Car Corporation, Corporate Parent Volvo Cars of North America, LLC, Corporate Parent Zhejiang Geely Holding Group Co., Ltd. for Volvo Car USA LLC. (Patterson, Barden) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Volvo Car USA LLC.(Patterson, Barden) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Volvo Car USA LLC answer due 12/20/2021. (jc5) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE UNOPPOSED by Volvo Car USA LLC (Patterson, Barden) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MicroPairing Technologies LLC. Volvo Car USA LLC served on 10/28/2021, answer due 11/18/2021. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Volvo Car USA LLC. (lad) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15371107), filed by MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MicroPairing Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Volvo Car USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Victor Depew