This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/12/2021 at 08:36:07 (UTC).

MicroPairing Technologies, LLC v. Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 MicroPairing Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eli J. Richardson and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00631

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MicroPairing Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian P. Herrmann

C. Austin Ginnings

Edward R. Nelson, III

Ryan P. Griffin

Timothy E. Grochocinski

Van R. Irion

Defendant Attorneys

Edward D. Lanquist, Jr.

Scott McLean Douglass

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

16 #1

Attachment Affidavit of Service

#16

#15

#11

#9

1 #10

Attachment - Report re Patent Case

1 #9

Exhibit 9 - Owner's Manual

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - 028 Claims Chart

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - 049 Claims Chart

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - 136 Patent

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - 117 Patent

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - 028 Patent

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - 049 Patent

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. answer due 11/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/4/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2021

DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Edward D. Lanquist, Jr and Scott McLean Douglass admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott McLean Douglass on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Douglass, Scott) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, or Other Pleading by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (Lanquist, Edward) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward D. Lanquist, Jr on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Lanquist, Edward) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) SUMMONS returned executed by MicroPairing Technologies, LLC. Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. served on 9/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Service)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint for Patent Infringement, Notice of Setting of Initial Case Management Conference, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibits 1-9 served on Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. by serving its Registered Agent, CT Corporation System on 09/14/21, filed by MicroPairing Technologies, LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER granting #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , and #12 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Charles Austin Ginnings, Ryan Griffin, Brian P. Herrmann, Timothy E. Grochocinski, Edward R. Nelson III to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 08/20/2021. (lh) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MicroPairing Technologies, LLC for Plaintiff's Motions PHV (Irion, Van) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 , #9 , #10 , #11 and #12 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
08/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/16/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2021

DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL Edward R. Nelson, III, Ryan P. Griffin, Brian P. Herrmann, Timothy E. Grochocinski, and C. Austin Ginnings: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/7/2021. (kc) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2021

DocketState Bar status verified as active for Edward R. Nelson, III (TX), Ryan P. Griffin (TX), Brian P. Herrmann (TX), Timothy E. Grochocinski (IL), and C. Austin Ginnings (NY) not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2021

DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Van R. Irion not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (kc) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons issued as to Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail for service of process.) (kc) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 10/21/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 06503429172), filed by MicroPairing Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 049 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2 - 028 Patent, #3 Exhibit 3 - 117 Patent, #4 Exhibit 4 - 136 Patent, #5 Exhibit 5 - 049 Claims Chart, #6 Exhibit 6 - 028 Claims Chart, #7 Exhibit 7 - 117 Claims Chart, #8 Exhibit 8 - 136 Claims Chart, #9 Exhibit 9 - Owner's Manual, #10 Attachment - Report re Patent Case, #11 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less