This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2021 at 08:04:33 (UTC).

MicroPairing Technologies LLC v. Kia America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 MicroPairing Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Kia America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00882

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MicroPairing Technologies LLC

Defendant

Kia America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan E Hatch

Brian P. Herrmann

Charles Austin Ginnings

Edward R. Nelson

Ryan P. Griffin

Timothy E. Grochocinski

Defendant Attorneys

D James Pak

Lance L Yang

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kia America, Inc. answer now due 7/19/2021, filed by defendant Kia America, Inc..(Yang, Lance) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kia America, Inc., identifying Kia Corporation. (Yang, Lance) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney D James Pak on behalf of Defendant Kia America, Inc. (Attorney D James Pak added to party Kia America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pak, D) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lance L Yang on behalf of Defendant Kia America, Inc. (Attorney Lance L Yang added to party Kia America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Yang, Lance) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 8/9/2021 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 8/2/2021. (lb) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ryan E Hatch counsel for Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. Changing 13323 Washington Blvd., Ste. 100, Los Angeles, CA 90066 to 13323 Washington Blvd., Ste. 302 Los Angeles, CA 90066. Filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC, upon Defendant Kia America, Inc. served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent for Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:21-cv-00881 JVS(KESx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-00882 JVS(KESx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna (rn) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31336321) filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
05/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ryan P. Griffin on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kia America, Inc. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC, identifying MicroPairing Technologies LLC, Hatch Law PC, Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC, Neoteric IP, Inc., and Kia America, Inc.. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31284122 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13) (Attorney Ryan E Hatch added to party MicroPairing Technologies LLC(pty:pla))(Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less