On May 12, 2021, MicroPairing Technologies LLC (“MicroPairing” or “Plaintiff”) represented by Ryan E Hatch of Hatch Law PC filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Hyundai Motor America (“Hyundai” or “Defendant”), seeking damages, accounting of damages, and other reliefs for alleged patent infringement by the Defendant. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Central District of California with Judge James V. Selna and Judge Karen E. Scott presiding.
Plaintiff asserted that MicroPairing is the owner of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,778,073 (“the ’073 patent”), 7,793,136 (“the ’136 patent”), 8,953,816 (“the ’816 patent”), 9,697,015 (“the ’015 patent”), 8,583,292 (“the ’292 patent”), and 7,178,049 (the ’049 patent”), (collectively, “patent-in-suit”) with all substantial rights, including the exclusive right to enforce, sue, and recover damages for past and future infringements.
In the complaint, MicroPairing has alleged that “Hyundai has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the patents in suit in this District and elsewhere in California and the United States. To this end, Hyundai has infringed and continues to infringe, either by itself or via an agent, among other things, making, offering to sell, selling, testing and/or using Hyundai and Genesis vehicles with infotainment systems. Hyundai has also indirectly infringed and continues to indirectly infringe one or more claims of the patent by inducing direct infringement by its Hyundai and Genesis vehicle customers and end users.”
MicroPairing has further alleged that “Despite having knowledge (or being willfully blind to the fact) that use of the Hyundai and Genesis vehicles with infotainment systems infringe the patent, Hyundai has specifically intended, and continues to specifically intend, for persons who acquire and use such vehicles, including Hyundai’s customers and end users, to use the vehicles in a way that results in infringement of the patent. Hyundai instructs and encourages its customers and end users to use their Hyundai or Genesis vehicles in a manner that infringes the patent. For example, Hyundai provides users with a reference guide, such as the Genesis G90 Quick Reference Guide which guides users with instructions on how to use the infotainment system in a way that results in infringement of the patent.”
There are six counts for relief laid down by MicroPairing. The first count for relief is for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,778,073 directly under 35 U.S.C. § 271(a). The second count for relief is for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,793,136 directly under 35 U.S.C. § 271(a) and indirectly 35 U.S.C. § 271(b) by inducement. The third count for relief is for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,953,816 directly under 35 U.S.C. § 271(a) and indirectly 35 U.S.C. § 271(b) by inducement. The fourth count for relief is for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 9,697,015 directly and indirectly. The fifth count for relief is for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,583,292. The sixth count for relief is for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,178,049 directly and indirectly.
In its prayer for Relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court to adjudge that the Defendant has infringed the Patents in suit directly and indirectly and thus Hyundai must pay MicroPairing past and future damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284, including supplemental damages along with royalties, pre-judgment and post-judgment interest along with costs of litigation.
This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.
8:21-CV-00881
05/12/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Patent
James V. Selna
Karen E. Scott
MicroPairing Technologies LLC
Hyundai Motor America
Edward R. Nelson
Brian P. Herrmann
Timothy E. Grochocinski
Charles Austin Ginnings
Ryan P. Griffin
Ryan E Hatch
Lance L Yang
D James Pak
Docket(#33) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #29 , Notice of Appearance #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 06/14/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#32) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hyundai Motor America answer now due 7/19/2021, filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America.(Yang, Lance) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#31) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, identifying Hyundai Motor Company. (Yang, Lance) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#30) First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney D James Pak on behalf of Defendant Hyundai Motor America (Attorney D James Pak added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft))(Pak, D) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#29) First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lance L Yang on behalf of Defendant Hyundai Motor America (Attorney Lance L Yang added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft))(Yang, Lance) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#28) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 8/9/2021 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 8/2/2021. (lb) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#27) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ryan E Hatch counsel for Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. Changing 13323 Washington Blvd., Ste. 100, Los Angeles, CA 90066 to 13323 Washington Blvd., Ste. 302 Los Angeles, CA 90066. Filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 06/10/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#26) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC, upon Defendant Hyundai Motor America served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, National Registered Agents, Inc., Registered Agent for Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/09/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#25) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Micropairing Technologies LLC, designating Ryan E. Hatch as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 05/27/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#24) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31336273) filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/21/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ryan P. Griffin on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC, identifying MicroPairing Technologies LLC, Hatch Law PC, Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC, Neoteric IP, Inc., and Hyundai Motor America. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31283666 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12) (Attorney Ryan E Hatch added to party MicroPairing Technologies LLC(pty:pla))(Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
[-] Read Less