Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31283666 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12) (Attorney Ryan E Hatch added to party MicroPairing Technologies LLC(pty:pla))(Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC, identifying MicroPairing Technologies LLC, Hatch Law PC, Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC, Neoteric IP, Inc., and Hyundai Motor America. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ryan P. Griffin on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brian P Herrmann on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Timothy E Grochocinski on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#13) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 05/14/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#14) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edward R. Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31304360) filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/17/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#15) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian P. Herrmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31304416) filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/17/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#16) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan P. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31304521) filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/17/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#17) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Ryan P. Griffin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) MicroPairing Technologies LLC, designating Ryan E. Hatch as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 05/17/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#18) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Brian P. Hermann APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) MicroPairing Technologies LLC, designating Ryan E. Hatch as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 05/17/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#19) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Edward R. Nelson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) MicroPairing Technologies LLC, designating Ryan E. Hatch as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 05/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#20) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan E Hatch counsel for Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. Adding Charles Austin Ginnings as counsel of record for MicroPairing Technologies LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#21) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles A. Ginnings to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31312870) filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 New York - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Southern District of New York - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#22) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney Charles A. Ginnings APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) MicroPairing Technologies LLC, designating Ryan E. Hatch as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 05/18/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#23) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. MicroPairing Technologies LLC v. Hyundai Motor America Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-04034-JWH, 8:21-cv-00882-DOC and 8:21-cv-00885-DOC (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/19/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#24) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31336273) filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/21/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#25) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Micropairing Technologies LLC, designating Ryan E. Hatch as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 05/27/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#26) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC, upon Defendant Hyundai Motor America served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, National Registered Agents, Inc., Registered Agent for Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/09/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#27) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ryan E Hatch counsel for Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. Changing 13323 Washington Blvd., Ste. 100, Los Angeles, CA 90066 to 13323 Washington Blvd., Ste. 302 Los Angeles, CA 90066. Filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 06/10/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#28) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 8/9/2021 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 8/2/2021. (lb) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#29) First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lance L Yang on behalf of Defendant Hyundai Motor America (Attorney Lance L Yang added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft))(Yang, Lance) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#30) First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney D James Pak on behalf of Defendant Hyundai Motor America (Attorney D James Pak added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft))(Pak, D) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#31) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, identifying Hyundai Motor Company. (Yang, Lance) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#32) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hyundai Motor America answer now due 7/19/2021, filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America.(Yang, Lance) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#33) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #29 , Notice of Appearance #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 06/14/2021)
[-] Read Less