This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2021 at 09:35:21 (UTC).

MicroPairing Technologies LLC v. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On July 26, 2021, MicroPairing Technologies LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Brian P. Herrmann, Charles A. Ginnings, Edward Nelson, III, Ryan Griffin and Timothy E. Grochocinski of Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against General Motors LLC (“Defendant”), seeking declaratory reliefs and damages along with pre-judgement and post-judgement reliefs, among other reliefs, for the alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of the U.S. Patent Nos. 7,178,049 (the ’049 patent”), 8,020,028 (“the ’028 patent), and 8,006,117 (“the ’117 patent”) (collectively, “Patents-in-suit”) owned by the Plaintiff.

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “General Motors has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’049 patent in this District and elsewhere in Texas and the United States” and “To this end, General Motors has infringed and continues to infringe, either by itself or via an agent, at least claims 29 – 31 of the ’049 patent by, among other things, testing and using General Motors Vehicles equipped with General Motors Infotainment Systems, and/or by directing, controlling, and setting into operation the performance of the claimed methods of the ’049 patent”

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “General Motors has indirectly infringed and continues to indirectly infringe one or more claims of the ’049 patent by inducing direct infringement by its customers and end users” and “General Motors has knowledge of the ’049 patent, its infringements, and the infringements of its customers and end users based, at least, on its receipt of this Complaint in this action.”

Further the Plaintiff alleged that, “Despite having knowledge (or being willfully blind to the fact) that use of the General Motors Vehicles equipped with General Motors Infotainment Systems infringe the ’049 patent, General Motors has specifically intended, and continues to specifically intend, for persons who acquire and use such vehicles, including General Motors’ customers and end users, to use the vehicles in a way that results in infringement of the ’049 patent, including at least claims 29 – 31.”

Similar allegations have been made by the Plaintiff with reference to the alleged infringement of other Patents-in-suit. 

There are three claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first and second claims are for the alleged direct infringement pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271(a) and alleged indirect infringement pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271(b) of ’049 and ’028 respectively. The third claim is for the alleged direct infringement pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271(a) of ’117.

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court for declaratory reliefs along with an award for past and future damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284, including supplementary damages for any continuing, post-verdict infringement. The Plaintiff also requested the Court for reasonable ongoing royalties and costs along with prejudgement and post-judgement interests and any other relief the court deems just.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00761

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MicroPairing Technologies LLC

Defendant

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian P. Herrmann

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy P.C.

3131 West 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Charles Austin Ginnings

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC

15020 S. Ravinia Ave., Suite 29

Orland Park, IL 60462

Ryan Griffin

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC

2727 N. Harwood Street, Suite 250

Dallas, TX 75201

Timothy E. Grochocinski

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy PC

15020 S. Ravinia Ave., Suite 29

Orland Park, IL 60462

Edward Nelson, III

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Conroy P.C.

3131 West 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Defendant Attorneys

Justin Edwin Gray

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP

12255 El Camino Real, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

Nicola A. Pisano

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP

12255 El Camino Real, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

Ian Scott Shelton

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP

600 Congress Avenue, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Jose L. Patino

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP

12255 El Camino Real, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

Ronald W. Zdrojeski

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP

1114 Sixth Avenue, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

14 #1

Proposed Order for Ronald W. Zdrojeski

#14

13 #1

Proposed Order for Justin Edwin Gray

#13

12 #1

Proposed Order for Nicola A. Pisano

#12

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

25 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ronald W. Zdrojeski. Attorney added for General Motors LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin Edwin Gray. Attorney added for General Motors LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicola A. Pisano. Attorney added for General Motors LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jose L. Patino. Attorney added for General Motors LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ian Scott Shelton for Ronald W. Zdrojeski ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15237683) by on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Ronald W. Zdrojeski)(Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ian Scott Shelton for Justin Edwin Gray ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15237631) by on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Justin Edwin Gray)(Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ian Scott Shelton for Nicola A Pisano ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15237571) by on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Nicola A. Pisano)(Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ian Scott Shelton for Jose L. Patino ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15237533) by on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Jose L. Patino)(Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by General Motors LLC. (Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss MicroPairing's Claims of Induced Infringement by General Motors LLC. (Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT by General Motors LLC (Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Ian) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MicroPairing Technologies LLC. General Motors LLC served on 7/28/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to General Motors LLC. (ir) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ir) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15051002), filed by MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MicroPairing Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald W. Zdrojeski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian Scott Shelton