This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2021 at 08:11:40 (UTC).

MicroPairing Technologies LLC v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 MicroPairing Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against American Honda Motor Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04034

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MicroPairing Technologies LLC

Defendant

American Honda Motor Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan E Hatch

Brian P. Herrmann

Charles Austin Ginnings

Edward R. Nelson

Ryan P. Griffin

Timothy E. Grochocinski

Defendant Attorneys

Margaret M. Welsh

Neil P. Sirota

Robert L. Maier

Theodore W. Chandler

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

#18

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#42) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc., identifying Honda Motor Co., Ltd.. (Chandler, Theodore) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#41) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #36 Non-Resident Attorney Robert L. Maier APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc., designating Theodore W. Chandler as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#40) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #37 Non-Resident Attorney Neil P. Sirota APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc., designating Theodore W. Chandler as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#39) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #38 Non-Resident Attorney Margaret M. Welsh APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc., designating Theodore W. Chandler as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#38) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Margaret M. Welsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31505750) filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chandler, Theodore) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#37) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neil P. Sirota to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31505657) filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chandler, Theodore) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#36) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert L. Maier to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31504848) filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chandler, Theodore) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket(#35) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by DEFENDANT American Honda Motor Co., Inc..(Attorney Theodore W. Chandler added to party American Honda Motor Co., Inc.(pty:dft))(Chandler, Theodore) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docket(#34) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 8/9/2021 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 8/2/2021. (lb) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docket(#33) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC, upon Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. served on 6/1/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent for Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ryan P Griffin on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edward R Nelson III on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC, identifying MicroPairing Technologies LLC, Hatch Law PC, Nelson Bumgardner Albritton PC, Neoteric IP, Inc., and American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31291710 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff MicroPairing Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12) (Attorney Ryan E Hatch added to party MicroPairing Technologies LLC(pty:pla))(Hatch, Ryan) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less