This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 07:36:06 (UTC).

Micolucci v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Micolucci filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harvey E. Schlesinger and Monte C. Richardson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00047

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harvey E. Schlesinger

Referral Judge

Monte C. Richardson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Micolucci

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donna V. Smith

Attorney at Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, PA

1110 N Florida Ave Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33602-3343

Richard E. Fradette

Attorney at Fradette Law Office, PLLC

91 Bay Street

Manchester, NH 03104

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Bernard Jones

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

111 N Orange Ave Ste 1750

Orlando, FL 32801

Nicole Bermel Dunlap

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

111 North Orange Avenue, Suite 1750

Orlando, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDERED: this case is TRANSFERRED to the Honorable Brian J. Davis, with his consent because it is related to 3:21-cv-676-BJD-MCR. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 3/2/2022. (TPL) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Richard E. Fradette on behalf of Anthony Micolucci. Lead Counsel: Richard E. Fradette, Esquire. (Fradette, Richard) (Entered: 02/27/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jeffrey Bernard Jones on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Lead Counsel: JEFFREY B. JONES. (Jones, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#14

(#14) UNIFORM CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Dunlap, Nicole) (Modified on 2/25/2022 to edit text) (TPL). (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Dunlap, Nicole) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Dunlap, Nicole) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Dunlap, Nicole) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#10

(#10) WAIVER of service returned executed on 01/19/2022 by Anthony Micolucci as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Fradette, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

8 #1

Appendix

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Richard E. Fradette to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19147696 for $150 by Anthony Micolucci. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Smith, Donna) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Anthony Micolucci. (Smith, Donna) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Anthony Micolucci. Related case(s): No (Smith, Donna) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (KEM) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19121057) filed by Anthony Micolucci. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Donna) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDERED: this case is TRANSFERRED to the Honorable Brian J. Davis, with his consent because it is related to 3:21-cv-676-BJD-MCR. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 3/2/2022. (TPL) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Richard E. Fradette on behalf of Anthony Micolucci. Lead Counsel: Richard E. Fradette, Esquire. (Fradette, Richard) (Entered: 02/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jeffrey Bernard Jones on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Lead Counsel: JEFFREY B. JONES. (Jones, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE to counsel Jeffrey Jones and Nicole Dunlap of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE to counsel Richard Fradette and Donna Smith of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) UNIFORM CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Dunlap, Nicole) (Modified on 2/25/2022 to edit text) (TPL). (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Dunlap, Nicole) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Dunlap, Nicole) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Dunlap, Nicole) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER of service returned executed on 01/19/2022 by Anthony Micolucci as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Fradette, Richard) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission. If Richard E. Fradette has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/24/2022. (ADM) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Richard E. Fradette to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19147696 for $150 by Anthony Micolucci. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Smith, Donna) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Anthony Micolucci. (Smith, Donna) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Anthony Micolucci. Related case(s): No (Smith, Donna) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (KEM) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to counsel Richard E. Fradette Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KEM) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:22-cv-0047-HES-MCR. (SJB) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19121057) filed by Anthony Micolucci. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Donna) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant